Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sidney A Fitzwater
Case #: 3:24-cv-01549
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:01 AM CST
Defendant
Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By
Melissa Dorman Matthews
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Beth G Jaynes
Steptoe-Johnson PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia R Culver
1954 Texas 408 Kingswood Drive Burleson
Burleson, TX 76028


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/20 12:08 AM
Third MOTION to Extend Time filed by Marcia R Culver (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Monday, May 19, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/19 5:37 PM
MOTION to Extend Time filed by Marcia R Culver (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Status Report Mon 05/19 3:53 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT OF TRIAL LENGTH and STATUS REPORT CONCERNING THE PROGRESS OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Swartz, Guy)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 18, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time Sun 05/18 10:48 PM
MOTION to Extend Time filed by Marcia R Culver (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) email Summary
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/09 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guy Wesley Swartz on behalf of Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Swartz, Guy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/31 4:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Beth G. Jaynes is withdrawn from this action as attorney of record for Defendant. Melissa Dorman Matthews of Steptoe & Johnson PLLC will remain as counsel of record for Defendant. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/31/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/31 3:31 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC (Jaynes, Beth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
22 22 order Protective Order Wed 09/18 1:51 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER (as modified by the court). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/18/2024) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 09/18 3:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marcia R Culver. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Culver, Marcia) (Main Document 19 replaced on 9/18/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/18 9:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2024. Discovery due by 5/19/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2024. Motions due by 6/23/2025. Status Report due by 5/19/2025. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/17/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 09/18 9:47 AM
TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for 11/3/2025 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/17/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Remark Tue 09/17 4:52 PM
ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: Please submit your proposed order for the following document -- in modifiable Word or WordPerfect format -- to Fitzwater_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov.: [17-1] Protective Order (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Wed 09/11 8:59 AM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Matthews, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Protective Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Wed 08/14 4:27 PM
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/11/2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/14/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 08/13 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Beth G. Jaynes on behalf of Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Matthews, Melissa)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 08/13 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Matthews, Melissa)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/13 11:58 AM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint,, filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party Lowes Home Centers LLC(pty:dft) (Matthews, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
misc Remark Fri 08/09 4:19 PM
***The clerk declines to enter default as no proof of service has been filed. (cfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
12 12 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 08/06 1:38 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Marcia R Culver. (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 08/05 11:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marcia R Culver (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 50 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/17 9:21 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lowes Home Centers LLC filed by Marcia R Culver. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cfk)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 07/17 9:20 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.); granting8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Culver is permitted to proceed pro se, without the requirement of local counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/17/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 07/16 4:46 PM
First MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Marcia R Culver (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Tue 07/16 4:37 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Order, filed by Marcia R Culver (Culver, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 3:03 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint, filed June 21, 2024, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. § 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC ("Lowes") for the following reason. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2024) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/26 5:07 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff has not have complied with the local counsel requirement of N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 83.10(a). Within 14 days of the date this order is filed, plaintiff(s) must file with the clerk of court one of the following: (1) a letter that demonstrates why counsel is not subject to, or is exempt from, the local counsel requirement of Rule 83.10(a) or that points out how and when local counsel has previously been designated; (2) a designation of local counsel that states local counsel's address and telephone number, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a), and includes the information required by N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 10.1(b); or (3) a motion for leave to proceed without local counsel. Counsel who are not members of the Bar of this court and have not been admitted pro hac vice in this case must at the same time apply for admission to the Bar or for admission pro hac vice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/26/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 06/21 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Lowes Home Centers LLC. (agc)
Related: [-]
3 3 49 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/21 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lowes Home Centers LLC filed by Marcia R Culver. (Filing fee $405.00; Receipt number 300012458) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 06/21 2:41 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Fitzwater Fri 06/21 2:41 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]