Oklahoma Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul R Thomas
Case #: 7:24-bk-80487
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Bacone College
2299 Old Bacone Rd
Muskogee, OK 74403-1568
Represented By
Ron D Brown
Ron Brown
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
No Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Office of the AUST, Karen Walsh PO Box 3044
Tulsa, OK 74101


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
147 147 answer Objection Mon 05/12 11:06 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Ron D Brown on behalf of Bacone College (Brown, Ron)
Related: [-] 141 Motion to Turnover Property filed by Debtor Bacone College
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
146 146 crditcrd none Wed 05/07 4:06 PM
Receipt of Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7([LINK 24-80487 ) [motion,mcnv7] ( 15.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Fee not due. Fee Amount 15.00 (Grimmett, David) (Grimmett)
Related: [-]
145 145 misc Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/07 3:43 PM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Karen Carden Walsh on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee Related [+]. (Walsh, Karen)
Related: [-] 143 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7,144 420A Form - Notice of Motion/Hearing Set
144 144 notice 420A Form - Notice of Motion/ Hearing Set Wed 05/07 3:31 PM
Notice of Motion and Hearing Filed by Karen Carden Walsh on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee Related [+]. Objections due by 5/28/2025. Hearing scheduled 6/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Ed Edmondson Courthouse 101 N 5th Muskogee Crtrm 4. (Walsh, Karen)
Related: [-] 143 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee
143 143 motion Convert Case to 7 Wed 05/07 3:27 PM
Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 . Fee Amount $15 Filed by Karen Carden Walsh on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Walsh, Karen)
Related: [-]