Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Christy Criswell Wiegand
Case #: 2:24-cv-00903
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Terminated:Jul 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
EDUCATIONAL COMPUTER SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff
ALEXYS TAYLOR
Represented By
Alfred Glenn Yates, Jr
Law Office Of Alfred G. Yates, Jr., P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 order Order Mon 07/15 8:12 AM
On July 1, 2024, the Court entered a Consolidation Order at Master Docket No. 2:24-cv-00666. See ECF No. 17. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk's Office is directed (1) to consolidate this action with Hood v. Educational Computer Systems, Inc. d/b/a Heartland ECSI, Case No. 2:24-cv-00666-CCW (W.D. Pa (W.D. Pa.); and (2) to mark this action CLOSED. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/15/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
6 6 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Mon 06/24 3:30 PM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (drc)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/24 3:29 PM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/24/24. (drc)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice of ADR Designation Mon 06/24 3:27 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (drc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 06/24 12:38 PM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by ALEXYS TAYLOR. (Yates, Alfred)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 06/24 9:28 AM
Summons Issued as to EDUCATIONAL COMPUTER SYSTEMS, INC. (bjr)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/24 9:22 AM
Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand added. (bjr)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Mon 06/24 9:29 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2024. (bjr)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Mon 06/24 9:41 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Attorney entered incorrect related case number. Attorney added the D/B/A in the party name. CORRECTION: For future reference. This message is for informational purposes only. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Fri 06/21 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against EDUCATIONAL COMPUTER SYSTEMS, INC. d/b/a HEARTLAND ECSI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8324205), filed by ALEXYS TAYLOR. (Yates, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons