Ghafi Ibrahim v. Department of Homeland Security et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03736 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 1:09 AM PST |
Defendant
Daniel A Bible
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Attorney General US Department of Justice
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy A. Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omar Ghafi Ibrahim
5330 Office Centre Court Suite 32
Bakersfield, CA 93309 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() REPLY filed byDepartment of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 32 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to an Extension of Time for Defendants' Reply and [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER RE A REVISED SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY AND THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 30 Stipulation. Replies due by 4/21/2025. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/30/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to a Revised Schedule for Defendants' Reply and the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byOmar Ghafi Ibrahim. (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byOmar Ghafi Ibrahim. (Lucero, Victoria) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Corrected to include TOC, TOA and new hearing date filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/17/2025. Replies due by 4/7/2025. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
26 | 26
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Wed 02/05 8:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS hearing set for April 25, 2025 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 29, 2025 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Declaration of Jaime J. Gray in Support of24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byDepartment of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ***ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD SEE DOC 27 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/17/2025. Replies due by 4/7/2025. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/5/2025 (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
23 | 23
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER TO A FOUR-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 22 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to a Four-Day Extension of Time for Defendants' Motion; [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of Time for Defendants' motion to dismiss filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. Responses due by 2/4/2025. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 19 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to a Proposed Schedule for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 17 Stipulation.(crblc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 15 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; and [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Mon 12/02 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Daniel A Bible, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION filed by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim. (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim(Lucero, Victoria) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim (Lucero, Victoria) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Victoria Lucero. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19578706.) filed by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim. (Lucero, Victoria) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued as to Daniel A Bible, Department of Homeland Security, Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Troy A. Miller, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 06/27 9:37 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Civil Cover Sheet by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim . (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 06/25 1:05 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our districts most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim (ark, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim.. (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Civil Cover Sheet by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim . (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19543150.). Filed by Omar Ghafi Ibrahim. (Gonzalez, Rebeca) |