California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-05258
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 1:16 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Premium Remodeling Inc
Represented By
Shula Roth-Barash, Sr
Heller And Edwards
contact info
Counter Claimant
Joseph Sastiel
Represented By
Shula Roth-Barash, Sr
Heller And Edwards
contact info
Counter Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Sheryl W Leichenger
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman And Moore LLP
contact info
Andrew Telles Wyatt
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Kristina A Fretwell
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman And Moore LLP
contact info
Kelly Ryan Graf
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steve Orocio
Defendant
Premium Remodeling Inc
Represented By
Shula Roth-Barash, Sr
Heller And Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Sastiel
Represented By
Shula Roth-Barash, Sr
Heller And Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Sheryl W Leichenger
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman And Moore LLP
contact info
Andrew Telles Wyatt
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Kristina A Fretwell
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman And Moore LLP
contact info
Kelly Ryan Graf
Dentons Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
40 40 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 02/18 8:59 PM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela: Based on the Stipulation37 , this matter is stayed pending resumption of the underlying action entitled Joseph Sastiel v. Steve Orocio, et al., Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. 20VECV00921, and all trial-related deadlines are hereby vacated. No later than 30 days after the stay is lifted in the underlying superior court action, the parties shall submit an amended Rule 26(f) Report. (gk)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/14 9:46 AM
STANDING ORDER For Civil Cases upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
38 38 4 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 10:43 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
37 37 stip Stay Case Fri 01/31 9:57 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of the Bankruptcy Action and Resumption of the Underlying Action or by 30 Days Notice of Any Party filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
36 36 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/29 12:21 PM
Judge Cynthia Valenzuela's designated initials are CV. On all documents filed in this case on or after January 29, 2025, substitute the initials CV after the case number in place of CVD. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
35 35 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 01/27 5:22 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-010) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela, this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05258 CVD(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
34 34 order Dismiss Fri 01/17 1:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PREMIUM REMODELING INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS; ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AS MOOT27 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Premium Remodeling, Inc.'s Counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Scottsdale Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims27 is DENIED as moot and the hearing on January 27, 2025, is VACATED. (iv)
Related: [-]
33 33 stip Dismiss Party Thu 01/16 9:06 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company filed by Defendants Premium Remodeling Inc, Joseph Sastiel.(Roth-Barash, Shula)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
32 32 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 01/13 10:23 AM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Premium Remodeling, Inc.'s Counterclaims 27 filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Objection to Premium Remodeling, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice
Sunday, January 05, 2025
31 31 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Sun 01/05 1:55 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Premium Remodeling, Inc.'s Counterclaims 27 filed by Defendants Premium Remodeling Inc, Joseph Sastiel, Counter Claimants Joseph Sastiel, Premium Remodeling Inc.(Roth-Barash, Shula)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibits 1 -3 to RJN
Monday, December 16, 2024
30 30 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 12/17 10:14 AM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 3/9/2026 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 to 7 Days**) set for 3/31/2026 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 12/17 10:08 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/9/2026. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
28 28 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 12/13 8:54 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company..(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Monday, November 25, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Mon 11/25 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Premium Remodeling, Inc.'s Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 5 Declaration of Kristina Fretwell,
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kristina Fretwell,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 11/19 1:52 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Telles Wyatt counsel for Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. Adding Andrew D. Telles Wyatt as counsel of record for Scottsdale Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attorney Andrew Telles Wyatt added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Telles Wyatt added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:cd))(Telles Wyatt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 11/19 1:43 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly Ryan Graf counsel for Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. Adding Kelly R. Graf as counsel of record for Scottsdale Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attorney Kelly Ryan Graf added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Ryan Graf added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:cd))(Graf, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 11/04 2:00 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Scottsdale Insurance Company answer now due 11/25/2024, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, Counterclaim,,19 filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 11/04 11:28 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On 11/1/2024, the Court issued an Order Setting Scheduling Conference22 (the "Order"). In light of Defendants' Notice of Unavailability of Counsel21 , the Court EXTENDS the deadline to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report, with a completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet (Exhibit A to the Order), to 12/6/2024, and VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on 12/2/2024 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will review the filed Report and set pretrial and trial dates by separate order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
22 22 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 11/01 3:34 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/01 9:44 AM
Notice filed by Defendants Premium Remodeling Inc, Joseph Sastiel. NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Roth-Barash, Shula)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/18 11:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Premium Remodeling Inc, Joseph Sastiel, identifying PREMIUM REMODELING, INC. and JOSEPH SASTIEL. (Roth-Barash, Shula)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim Fri 10/18 11:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND DEFENDANTS, PREMIUM REMODELING INC. AND JOSEPH SASTIEL, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY COMPLAINT, AND COUNTERCLAIMS FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTACT; 2. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALINGS; AND 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF , COUNTERCLAIM against Scottsdale Insurance Company filed by Defendants Joseph Sastiel, Premium Remodeling Inc.(Attorney Shula Roth-Barash, Sr added to party Premium Remodeling Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Shula Roth-Barash, Sr added to party Joseph Sastiel(pty:dft))(Roth-Barash, Shula)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
18 18 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 09/19 4:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS PREMIUM REMODELING, INC. AND JOSEPH SASTIEL TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants Premium Remodeling, Inc. and Joseph Sastiel's response to the Complaint shall be filed no later than October 18, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 09/18 3:11 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 18, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
16 16 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 09/06 3:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS PREMIUM REMODLING, INC. AND JOSEPH SASTIEL TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than September 23, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 09/04 10:19 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 23, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
14 14 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 08/07 2:37 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 08/06 10:38 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Premium Remodeling Inc answer now due 9/9/2024; Joseph Sastiel answer now due 9/9/2024, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 07/25 12:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, upon Defendant Steve Orocio served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Orocio in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 07/25 12:11 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, upon Defendant Joseph Sastiel served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joseph Sastiel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 07/25 11:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, upon Defendant Premium Remodeling Inc served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joseph Sastiel, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
9 9 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 06/28 9:53 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05258 MWF(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/25 10:11 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Steve Orocio, Premium Remodeling Inc, Joseph Sastiel. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 06/25 9:58 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 06/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 06/25 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/21 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, identifying Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 06/21 4:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/21 4:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/21 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405.00 paid on 06/21/2024, receipt number 37700038), filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attorney Kristina A Fretwell added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7