California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:24-cv-01079
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/27 3:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amy Campbell, Castro, Defendant B, Guckdrier, James Hill, M. Colnier, Jeff Macomber, Morreo, Randy, Rivers, Julian Salazar, filed by Gerald J. Wilson. [ Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915 ] Timely per mailbox rule (ggv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Wed 01/08 12:02 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint re (Doc. No.5 ). Amended Complaint due by 2/18/2025. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 01/08/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 12/30 3:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Gerald J. Wilson. (ggv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 25 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/31 4:13 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Complaint Without Prejudice Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) & 1915A(b)(1). The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $3.22 initial filing fee assessed, if those funds are available atthe time this Order is executed, and forward whatever balance remains of the full $350 owed in monthly payments in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding months income to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/31/24. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 06/25 1:09 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement from Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility - Trust Office. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/21 2:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald J. Wilson.(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inmate Statement Report
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/21 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Amy Campbell, Castro, Defendant B, Guckdrier, James Hill, M. Colnier, Jeff Macomber, Morreo, Randy, Rivers, Julian Salazar, IFP Filed, filed by Gerald J. Wilson. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1079-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.[ Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915 ] (dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope