Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:24-cv-02722
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By
Allegra J. Lawrence
Lawrence & Bundy, Llc-Atl
contact info
Katherine Kendricks
Lawrence & Bundy, Llc-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Helen Ward
Represented By
Cheryl Barnes Legare
Legare, Attwood & Ragan, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/22 3:42 PM
ORDER: The parties'25 Corrected Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline is GRANTED. The discovery period is extended until July 21, 2025. All deadlines related to the end of discovery shall run from this date. The parties' prior Motion to Extend Discovery24 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/22/2025. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/21 4:47 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Corrected Motion to Extend Discovery by Helen Ward.(Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/21 4:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Helen Ward.(Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
23 23 misc Leave of Absence Tue 04/15 9:12 AM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 20 - June 2, 2025, June 25-July 7, 2025, by Cheryl Barnes Legare. (Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
22 22 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 03/24 1:22 PM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/24/2022. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 motion Protective Order Fri 03/21 3:39 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Protective Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 motion Protective Order Wed 03/19 5:15 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Protective Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 1 pgs misc Leave of Absence Mon 03/10 10:24 AM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 7, 2025 through April 11, 2025 and June 2, 2025 through June 20, 2025, by Allegra J. Lawrence. (Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Wed 01/22 8:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/16 3:42 PM
ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline16 is GRANTED. The discovery period is extended until April 22, 2025. All deadlines running from the end of discovery shall run from that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/16/2025. (tcc)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/16 12:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Helen Ward.(Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/16 10:59 AM
NOTICE by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc. of Attorney's Change of Address and Law Firm Affiliation (Kendricks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/16 10:57 AM
NOTICE by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc. of Attorney's Change of Address and Law Firm Affiliation (Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Tue 12/03 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Documents to Defendant by Helen Ward.(Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COS - RPDs to Defendant
Thursday, November 07, 2024
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Thu 11/07 7:30 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pl's Answers to Interrogtories by Helen Ward.(Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COS - Pl's Responses to RPDs
Monday, September 30, 2024
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Mon 09/30 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Helen Ward.(Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Mon 09/30 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc..(Kendricks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/24 2:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 1/22/2025. Motions for Summary Judgment are due by 2/21/2025. Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Orders are due by 3/3/2025 or, in the event that any party files a motion for summary judgment, until thirty (30) days after the district court's final ruling on all pending motions for summary judgment, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 09/24/2024. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 discov Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 6:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 09/23 4:35 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Helen Ward. (Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 08/27 2:33 PM
Clerk's Notation re6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/23 6:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/23 6:47 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/21/2025.(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 07/24 10:51 AM
Clerk's Notation re4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/22 7:25 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Helen Ward. (Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/22 7:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Helen Ward. The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc. waiver mailed on 6/24/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Legare, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
2 2 2 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 06/21 2:50 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc. (ane)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/21 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Helen Ward. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13520542)(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet