Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:24-cv-02715
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
HILL-ROM COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
RICHARD A. POWERS
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
TARA A. O'MALLEY
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
Melanie L. Katsur
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
MARK R. MEADOR
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
BRANDON C. KRESSIN
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
ZACHARY C. MARTIN
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
ELIZABETH P. PAPEZ
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
HILL-ROM HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By
RICHARD A. POWERS
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
TARA A. O'MALLEY
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
Melanie L. Katsur
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
MARK R. MEADOR
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
BRANDON C. KRESSIN
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
ZACHARY C. MARTIN
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
ELIZABETH P. PAPEZ
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
HILL-ROM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
RICHARD A. POWERS
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
TARA A. O'MALLEY
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
Melanie L. Katsur
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
MARK R. MEADOR
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
BRANDON C. KRESSIN
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
ZACHARY C. MARTIN
Kressin Meador Powers LLC
contact info
ELIZABETH P. PAPEZ
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
READING HOSPITAL
Represented By
GARY I. SMITH, JR.
Hausfeld
contact info
KATIE R. BERAN
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
WILLIAM GORDON BALL
Gordon Ball, PLLC
contact info
SCOTT ALLAN MARTIN
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
MICHAEL P. LEHMANN
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
FARHAD MIRZADEH
Hausfield LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
58 58 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 04/02 8:46 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MELINDA R. COOLIDGE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/1/25.4/2/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
57 57 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 04/01 10:43 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Melinda R. Coolidge ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18184304.) filed by READING HOSPITAL..(SMITH, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
56 56 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Mon 03/31 11:51 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re55 Transcript - PDF, 3/31/25 Entered & E-mailed. (fdc)
Related: [-]
55 55 misc Transcript - PDF Mon 03/31 11:47 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 3/25/25, before Judge Gallagher. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melinda Friedland, EScribers. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/21/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2025. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
54 54 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 03/26 10:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/25 re32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HILL-ROM SERVICES, INC., HILL-ROM HOLDINGS, INC., HILL-ROM COMPANY, INC. Court Reporter: esr. (er)
Related: [-]