California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 3:24-cv-03714
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By
Lori B. Leskin
Arnold & Porter
contact info
Eskandar Alex Beroukhim
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nice-Pak Products, Inc.
Represented By
Lori B. Leskin
Arnold & Porter
contact info
Eskandar Alex Beroukhim
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Larisa Bullard
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Glatt
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Joshua Wilner
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mila Corrigan
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Glatt
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Joshua Wilner
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2025
ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting 16 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2025)
GPO May 14 2025
ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
43 43 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 05/14 11:23 AM
ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. (rslc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
42 42 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 05/14 7:56 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION TO DISMISS [#36] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON MAY 15, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
41 41 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 05/09 11:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/24/2025 is continued to 7/31/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
40 40 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 04/04 3:17 PM
REPLY Related [+] (First Amended Complaint) filed byCostco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. (Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-] 36 MOTION to Dismiss
Thursday, April 03, 2025
39 39 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 04/03 10:38 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg granting 38 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/10/2025 is continued to 7/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2025. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
38 38 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/02 2:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Larisa Bullard.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Friday, March 28, 2025
37 37 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 03/28 5:41 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLarisa Bullard. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-] 36 MOTION to Dismiss
Friday, March 14, 2025
36 36 motion Dismiss Fri 03/14 5:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/15/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Responses due by 3/28/2025. Replies due by 4/4/2025.(Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of E. Alex Beroukhim,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit G to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit H to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit I to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit J to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit K to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit L to Beroukhim Declaration,
Att: 14 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 15 Proposed Order
Friday, February 28, 2025
35 35 27 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/28 5:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. Filed by Larisa Bullard. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
34 34 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/14 4:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting 16 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend. (rslc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
33 33 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 01/30 9:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/6/2025 is continued to 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/28 3:42 PM
NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc. re16 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP. AND NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) (Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
31 31 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 01/06 4:32 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/16/2025 is continued to 2/6/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
30 30 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 11/07 7:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 11/14/2024 is continued to 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 11/07 2:15 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Larisa Bullard. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/18 1:22 PM
NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc. re16 MOTION to Dismiss re Notice of Supplemental Authority(Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/18 12:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lori B. Leskin. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/18 10:58 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19944513.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/11/2024 filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc..(Leskin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing in New York
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 10/18 10:08 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Missing Certificate of Good Standing. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety re:23 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $328, receipt number ACANDC-19944513) filed by Nice-Pak Products, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
25 25 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 10/17 11:51 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Glatt, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 10/11 2:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION TO DISMISS [#16] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON OCTOBER 17, 2024 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/11 11:31 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $328, receipt number ACANDC-19944513) filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc. (Leskin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 10/04 3:19 PM
REPLY Related [+] Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice filed byCostco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. (Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss
21 21 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 10/04 3:10 PM
REPLY Related [+] Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byCostco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. (Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 32 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 09/13 5:42 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLarisa Bullard.(Glatt, Joshua)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss
Att: 1 Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 08/14 6:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/26/2024 is continued to 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 08/14 6:12 PM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 08/14 5:18 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule and Continue Case Management Conference filed by Larisa Bullard. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/14 6:13 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing previously set for 10/3/2024 is continued to 10/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
16 16 28 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 08/09 5:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 10/3/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Responses due by 8/23/2024. Replies due by 8/30/2024.(Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of E. Alex Beroukhim,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/31 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Mila Corrigan's Claims Without Prejudice by Mila Corrigan (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 07/19 2:19 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. (Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eskandar Alex Beroukhim for Defendants Costco Wholesale Corp. and Nice-Pak Products, Inc. (Beroukhim, Eskandar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 07/11 5:20 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/19/2024 is continued to 9/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/11 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larisa Bullard, Mila Corrigan. Nice-Pak Products, Inc. served on 7/8/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/11 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larisa Bullard, Mila Corrigan. Costco Wholesale Corp. served on 7/2/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 06/25 10:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2024. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/25 9:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 06/21 2:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 06/21 2:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Larisa Bullard, Mila Corrigan.. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 06/21 11:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 06/21 9:36 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2024 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 06/21 8:11 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corp., Nice-Pak Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19539816.). Filed by Larisa Bullard, Mila Corrigan.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet