New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00891
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 1:38 AM MDT
Defendant
Diego Yahir Gaytan-Ruiz (1)
Represented By
Gia A. McGillivray
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Alex Jesus Quintana (2)
Represented By
Cori Ann Harbour-Valdez
The Harbour Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Brenda Richardson
U.S. Probation/pretrial
contact info
Laura Garibay
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher McNair
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/23/2024 2:57 AM MDT
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
Arrest of Diego Yahir Gaytan-Ruiz and Alex Jesus Quintana (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
Set/Reset Hearings as to Diego Yahir Gaytan-Ruiz and Alex Jesus Quintana: Initial Appearance set for 6/21/2024 at 09:06 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (bw)
Related: [-]
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Garibay, Laura)
Related: [-]