Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda Moody Whinery
Case #: 4:14-bk-17775
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Aug 24, 2015
Claims Deadline:Nov 23, 2015
Converted:Jun 10, 2015
Terminated:Jul 07, 2023
Discharge Objection Deadline:Mar 09, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
B & M EXCAVATING & HAULING, INC.
7550 E Dos Mujeres Rd
Tucson, AZ 85715-3509
Represented By
CHARLES R HYDE
Law Offices Of C.R. Hyde
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
TRUDY A. NOWAK
2001 E. Campbell Ave., Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85016
Represented By
JAMES S SAMUELSON
Sacks Tierney P.A.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003
Represented By
RENEE SANDLER SHAMBLIN
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 12:59 PM MST
Tuesday, December 02, 2014
1 1 other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1717.00 fee) Tue 12/02 1:30 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). The mailing list of creditors if not uploaded when the petition was filed, must be uploaded no later than seven days from the date of the filing of the petition. Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 12/23/2014, filed by CHARLES R HYDE of LAW OFFICES OF C.R. HYDE on behalf of B & M EXCAVATING & HAULING, INC. (HYDE, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Tue 12/02 11:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 01/08/2015 at 12:00 PM at U.S. Trustee Meeting Room, James A. Walsh Court, 38 S Scott Ave, St 140, Tucson, AZ (341-TUC). (Admin, )
Related: [-]