New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:24-cv-04777
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:21 AM EST
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
Uncharted Labs, Inc., d/b/a Udio.com
Represented By
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Nathan Edmund Taylor
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Todd Steven Anten
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew H. Schapiro
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Alex Spiro
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Steven Nathaniel Feldman
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Brittany N. Lovejoy
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Jessica Anne Rose
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arista Music
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arista Records LLC
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhino Entertainment Company
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Music Inc.
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Music International Services Limited
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records Inc.
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records LLC
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC
Represented By
Moez M. Kaba
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Mariah Rivera
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Jonathan Zachary King
Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC
contact info
Rajan Trehan
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Robert N. Klieger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Alexander Perry
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Special Master
Hon. James C. Francis IV (Ret.)


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
97 97 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/05 3:07 PM
ORDER granting96 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Time for document production is extended to July 25, 2025. The status conference scheduled for May 28, 2025 is adjourned to July 30, 2025 at 11:00 a.m in Courtroom 14D. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/2/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/05 3:09 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/30/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
96 96 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/02 10:28 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Document Production Deadline addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Moez M. Kaba dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC..(Perry, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
95 95 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 4:34 PM
CLARIFICATION OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL terminating91 Motion. I previously granted Defendants' motion to compel the production of the deposit copies of the Asserted Works, ECF No. 89. Plaintiffs now seek clarification of what they are required to produce under that Order. The best evidence rule that limits admissibility to only the original copy is not feasible here because the original copy is that filed with the United States Copyright Office. Where an original cannot be found, the Federal Rules of Evidence allow for the admission of a duplicate. Fed. R. Evid. 1003; see also Chicoineau v. Bonnier Corp., No. 18-cv-3264 (JSR), 2018 WL 6039387, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 16, 2018). Plaintiff's obligation is to produce the truest copy in their possession, whether analog or digital, along with a representation establishing that those copies are identical to the deposit copies submitted for registration with the United States Copyright Office and identifying when the copy produced was made and from what source. The Clerk is directed to terminate the open motion, ECF No. 91. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
94 94 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 04/29 7:57 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:91 MOTION for clarification re:89 Order,,,, to Produce Deposit Copies . . Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc., Warner Records LLC, Warner Records/SIRE Ventures LLC..(Trehan, Rajan)
Related: [-]