Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:24-cv-00275
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 6:11 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Axle Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Parks T Chastain
Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain PLLC
contact info
Thomas H Shields, III
Axle Logistics, LLC
contact info
Hannah Leifel
Brewer, Krause, Brooks And Chastain, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
LPI, Inc.
Represented By
Leslie T Ridings
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info
Will Andrew Ellis
Hunter, Smith & Davis, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Axle Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Parks T Chastain
Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain PLLC
contact info
Thomas H Shields, III
Axle Logistics, LLC
contact info
Hannah Leifel
Brewer, Krause, Brooks And Chastain, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Z Exchange, LLC
Represented By
John Paul Nefflen
Thompson Burton
contact info
Plaintiff
LPI, Inc.
Represented By
Leslie T Ridings
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info
Will Andrew Ellis
Hunter, Smith & Davis, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Fri 01/17 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by LPI, Inc. (Ridings, Leslie)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File Consent/Non-Consent Fri 01/17 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
35 35 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/23 11:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/10/2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2026 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr. See Order for additional dates and details. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/23/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
34 34 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 12/19 11:00 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ridings, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 12/04 3:33 PM
ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court is no longer able to conduct the telephonic scheduling conference presently scheduled for December 16, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. ET. [Doc. 31]. Accordingly, the scheduling conference is CANCELED. In lieu of participating in a scheduling conference, the parties are hereby ORDERED to confer and develop a discovery plan in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The parties' discovery plan must comply in all material respects with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). The parties must file a written report outlining the discoveryplan on or before December 19, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/4/2024. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
32 32 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 11/21 4:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/21 1:00 PM
ORDER: In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b), the undersigned United States District Judge will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on December 16, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. EASTERN TIME . See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 11/21/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 11/19 11:01 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 11/19/2024. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/19 10:08 AM
First Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint by Z Exchange, LLC.(Nefflen, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
28 28 8 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support (non-motion) Mon 11/18 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re27 Response in Opposition to Motion .(Shields, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Term and Conditions,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email of Hatley
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 2:20 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Axle Logistics, LLC. (Shields, Thomas)
Related: [-]
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 12:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Z Exchange, LLC.(Nefflen, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/21 3:45 PM
ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. For good cause shown and based on the Parties' agreement, the Joint Motion is GRANTED. Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Axle Logistics, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant LPI, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss on or before November 18, 2024. No document is attached. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 10/21/2024. (JRT)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/21 11:33 AM
Now before the Court is the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond on Behalf of Defendant Z Exchange, LLC [Doc. 22]. In light of no objection [ see Doc. 23 p. 2], and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 22] . Defendant Z Exchange, LLC SHALL file a response to the Complaint on or before November 18, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 10/21/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/18 4:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss , 21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, by Axle Logistics, LLC. (Shields, Thomas)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/18 10:15 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Z Exchange, LLC. (Nefflen, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/03 10:16 AM
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. For good cause shown and based on the Parties' agreement, the Joint Motion is GRANTED. Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Axle Logistics, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant LPI, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss on or before October 18, 2024. The Parties are ORDERED to promptly notify the Court if they resolve this matter via settlement. No document is attached. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 10/3/2024. (JRT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/02 3:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss by Axle Logistics, LLC. (Shields, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 09/27 10:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LPI, Inc.. Z Exchange, LLC served on 9/27/2024. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
18 18 9 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 09/12 2:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LPI, Inc.. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Thu 09/12 2:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by LPI, Inc.. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Alias Summons Issued Thu 09/12 2:14 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Z Exchange, LLC. (ABF)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Supplement Thu 09/12 1:18 PM
SUPPLEMENT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by LPI, Inc.. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 09/12 1:07 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by LPI, Inc. as to Z Exchange, LLC. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/22 4:47 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and due to lack of opposition, the Joint Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's counterclaim on or before September 12, 2024. The Parties are ORDERED to promptly notify the Court if they resolve this matter via settlement. No document is attached. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 08/22/2024. (JRT)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/22 3:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by LPI, Inc.. (Ridings, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 07/30 1:28 PM
STIPULATION Agreed by LPI, Inc.. (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/12 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T Chastain on behalf of Axle Logistics, LLC (Chastain, Parks)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Citizenship Fri 07/12 2:59 PM
Certificate of Citizenship by Axle Logistics, LLC. (Leifel, Hannah)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 07/12 2:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against LPI, Inc. by Axle Logistics, LLC.(Leifel, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Credit Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Terms,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Invoice No. 0741965,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Invoice No. 0765730,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Invoice No. 0772841,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Invoice No. 0780160,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Invoice No. 0780219,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Invoice No. 0780098,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Invoice No. 0788439,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Invoice No. 0790849,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Invoice No.0798305
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Thu 06/27 10:47 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by LPI, Inc.. Amendment to1 Complaint Corporate Disclosure . (Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Tue 06/25 2:59 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/25/2024. (LCK)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Tue 06/25 2:58 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/25/2024. (LCK)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Tue 06/25 2:53 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/25/2024. (LCK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/25 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Axle Logistics, LLC, Z Exchange, LLC.(LCK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Z Exchange, LLC
Monday, June 24, 2024
2 2 misc Supplement Mon 06/24 4:05 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint Civil Summons by LPI, Inc..(Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against LPI, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5711990.), filed by LPI, Inc..(Ellis, Will)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Other Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/25 2:37 PM
District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (LCK)
Related: [-]