Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Jared M Strauss
Case #: 0:24-cv-61100
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:17 AM EST
Defendant
Prince Laboratories, LLC
Represented By
Rachel Megan Fleishman
Sessions, Israel And Shartle, LLC
contact info
Bradley Joseph St. Angelo
Sessions, Israel , Shartle, LLC
contact info
Mediator
David Jones
Plaintiff
Dmitry Zinger
Represented By
Avi Robert Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info
Rachel E Kaufman
Kaufman PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 01/08 11:08 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 01/07 2:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dmitry Zinger (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 10/21 8:42 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Hon. David E. Jones Mediation Hearing set for 4/2/2025 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 10/18 1:36 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added David Jones as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/2/2025 at 10:00 a.m..(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
15 15 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 09/10 2:48 PM
DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 9/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/10 2:30 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 12/15/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 12/10/2025 02:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2024., Discovery due by 5/29/2025., Expert Discovery due by 5/29/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2024., In Limine Motions due by 10/23/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2025., Motions due by 6/30/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/28/2025.), (Mediation Deadline 4/30/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 09/09 11:51 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Dmitry Zinger(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 19, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 08/19 10:37 AM
Order Requiring Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/16 4:28 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prince Laboratories, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prince Laboratories, LLC for Prince Laboratories, LLC (St. Angelo, Bradley)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/16 4:25 PM
Prince Laboratories, LLC d/b/a J&J Medical's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Prince Laboratories, LLC. Attorney Bradley Joseph St. Angelo added to party Prince Laboratories, LLC(pty:dft). (St. Angelo, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 07/17 10:34 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or by 8/16/2024 . Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2024. (lp00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 07/16 4:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Prince Laboratories, LLC. Attorney Rachel Megan Fleishman added to party Prince Laboratories, LLC(pty:dft). (Fleishman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 06/27 12:47 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Dmitry Zinger. Prince Laboratories, LLC served on 6/26/2024, response/answer due 7/17/2024. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/26 9:57 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dmitry Zinger (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 06/26 9:17 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/26/2024. (lp00)
Related: [-]
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 06/26 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/26/2024. (lp00)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/25 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Prince Laboratories, LLC. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 06/25 9:06 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Prince Laboratories, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17628893, filed by Dmitry Zinger.(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)