California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 8:24-cv-01387
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 2:10 AM PST
Defendant
Piccole Stivale
Defendant
Does
Defendant
EFH H Investments, L.P.
Plaintiff
Julio Cruz
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Friday, August 09, 2024
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 08/09 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 07/17 1:55 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISABILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 07/10 10:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/26 11:44 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants EFH H Investments, L.P., Piccole Stivale. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 06/26 11:42 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 06/26 11:42 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 06/26 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 06/24 2:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 06/24 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 06/24 2:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/24 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37709449 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Julio Cruz(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]