California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:24-cv-00742
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 2:05 AM PST
Defendant
Ryan Dutton
Defendant
Dutton Landscape Services
Plaintiff
State National Insurance Company
Represented By
Catharine M. Tolson
Wolkin Curran, LLP
contact info
Brandt Louis Wolkin
Wolkin Curran, LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 11 2024
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE NOTICE OF STATUS OF SERVICE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/11/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than October 18, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a notice regarding the status of service on Defendants Dutton Landscape Services and Ryan Dutton. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this order may result in the issuance of sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. (Vue, Yee)
GPO Oct 16 2024
ORDER CONSTRUING NOTICE OF STATUS OF SERVICE AS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, VACATING ALL MATTERS, AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2024. It is HEREBY ORDERED that all pending matters and dates in this action are VACATED. Plaintiff shall file dispositional documents within ninety (90) days of entry of this order. (Nguyen, J)
GPO Jan 15 2025
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/15/2025. The Court grants the request and ORDERS that the parties shall have through January 27, 2025, to file dispositional documents. Any further request for an extension must be supported by good cause. L.R. 160(b). (Deputy Clerk JN)
GPO Jan 17 2025
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk JPX)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/17 8:08 AM
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk JPX)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Fri 01/17 8:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-00742-JLT-SAB. (Deputy Clerk JPX)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/16 12:50 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by State National Insurance Company. (Tolson, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/15 1:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/15/2025. The Court grants the request and ORDERS that the parties shall have through January 27, 2025, to file dispositional documents. Any further request for an extension must be supported by good cause. L.R. 160(b). (Deputy Clerk JN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/14 4:45 PM
NOTICE Of Status of Dismissal by State National Insurance Company. (Tolson, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/16 4:31 PM
ORDER CONSTRUING NOTICE OF STATUS OF SERVICE AS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, VACATING ALL MATTERS, AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2024. It is HEREBY ORDERED that all pending matters and dates in this action are VACATED. Plaintiff shall file dispositional documents within ninety (90) days of entry of this order. (Nguyen, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/15 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Status of Service by State National Insurance Company re6 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,. (Tolson, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/11 9:17 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE NOTICE OF STATUS OF SERVICE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/11/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than October 18, 2024 , Plaintiff shall file a notice regarding the status of service on Defendants Dutton Landscape Services and Ryan Dutton. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this order may result in the issuance of sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. (Vue, Yee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
5 5 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 07/23 4:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tolson, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Mon 06/24 4:48 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A(m),
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Mon 06/24 4:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ryan Dutton, Dutton Landscape Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Catharine M. Tolson* *Wolkin Curran, LLP* *111 Maiden Lane, Sixth Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94108*. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/24 12:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff State National Insurance Company. (Tolson, Catharine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by State National Insurance Company. Attorney Tolson, Catharine M. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11597577) (Tolson, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet