Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Tanya Walton Pratt
Referred: M Kendra Klump
Case #: 1:24-cv-01073
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause12:22 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:27 AM EST
Defendant
ROBERT K. HERDMAN
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
MARK A SMITH
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
JENNIFER RUMSEY
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
KAREN H. QUINTOS
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
KIMBERLY A. NELSON
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
GEORGIA R. NELSON
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM I. MILLER
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS J. LYNCH
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
NORMAN T. LINEBARGER
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
ALEXIS M. HERMAN
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
CARLA A. HARRIS
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN B. DOBBS
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
BRUNO V. DI LEO
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
FRANKLIN R. CHANG DIAZ
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT J. BERNHARD
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
GARY L. BELSKE
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
CUMMINS, INC.
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Timothy Perla
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Michael Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Sonia Sujanani
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA INGERSOLL
Represented By
Mary Ellen Conner
Johnson Fistel, LLP
contact info
Scott D. Gilchrist
Cohen & Malad LLP
contact info
Michael I. Fistel, Jr
Johnson Fistel, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/25/2024 12:20 AM EDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
1 1 49 pgs COMPLAINT (Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Joshua Ingersoll. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8219446)(Gilchrist, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Gilchrist on behalf of Plaintiff Joshua Ingersoll. (Gilchrist, Scott)
Related: [-]