Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Case #: 1:24-cv-22426
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:18 AM EST
Defendant
Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Martin B. Goldberg
Lash & Goldberg
contact info
Christopher Kimbrough Smith
Lash & Goldberg, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Elan Feuer
Lash & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tenet Healthcare, Corp.
Represented By
Martin B. Goldberg
Lash & Goldberg
contact info
Christopher Kimbrough Smith
Lash & Goldberg, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Elan Feuer
Lash & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Mediator
PAMELA I PERRY
One Biscayne Tower 2 South Biscayne Boulevard Suite 2030
Miami, FL 33131
Plaintiff
Emergency Recovery, Inc.
Represented By
David Michael Zack
Blevins Sanborn Jezdimir Zack PLC
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2025
ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, granting in part and denying in part 28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC, Tenet Healthcare, Corp. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
50 50 17 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 01/10 2:31 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, granting in part and denying in part28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC, Tenet Healthcare, Corp. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]