District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:24-cv-01798
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:46 AM EST
Defendant
HOLLY L. TEETER
Represented By
Douglas C. Dreier
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
GANIYU JAIYEOLA
Dr. 10870 North Stelling Road #37D
Cupertino, CA 95014


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 5 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 05/05 8:50 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re24 MOTION to Vacate23 Order,22 Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice, Order on Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS RULE 60(b) MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER NOT TO TRANSFER THIS LAWSUIT TO THE U.S. DISTRICT IN KANSAS PURSUANT TO Fed. R. App. P. 4(a) filed by HOLLY L. TEETER.(Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
24 24 motion Vacate Mon 04/21 1:52 PM
MOTION to Vacate23 Order,22 Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice, Order on Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS RULE 60(b) MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER NOT TO TRANSFER THIS LAWSUIT TO THE U.S. DISTRICT IN KANSAS PURSUANT TO Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(A)(vi) by GANIYU JAIYEOLA. (JAIYEOLA, GANIYU)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
23 23 order .Order Mon 03/24 3:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying as moot16 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/24/2025. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/24 3:44 PM
ORDER denying as moot16 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/24/2025. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 11/27 9:21 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 Motion to Dismiss filed by HOLLY L. TEETER. (Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
20 20 respm Response to motion Fri 11/22 8:53 PM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Response To Defendant Teeter's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by GANIYU JAIYEOLA.(JAIYEOLA, GANIYU)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
19 19 order .Order Wed 10/23 11:55 AM
FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond, on or before November 22, 2024, to17 Defendant's motion to dismiss, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/2024. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 2 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 10/21 3:54 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re16 Motion to Take Judicial Notice, - Duplicate of ECF No. 17 filed by HOLLY L. TEETER.(Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 10/21 3:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by HOLLY L. TEETER.(Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 11, 2024
16 16 motion Take Judicial Notice Fri 10/11 3:07 AM
MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Judicial Notice: The Interest of Justice Is Served By Having The Venue For This Lawsuit As The U.S. District Court For The District Of Columbia by GANIYU JAIYEOLA.(JAIYEOLA, GANIYU)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, October 07, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/07 3:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HOLLY L. TEETER with Jury Demand filed by Ganiyu Jaiyeola.(Jaiyeola, Ganiyu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, September 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password Fri 09/20 11:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Motion for CM/ECF Password: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a CM/ECF username and password is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff may obtain a CM/ECF username and password from the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/20/2024. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 motion CM/ECF Password Thu 09/19 12:09 PM
Second MOTION for CM/ECF Password by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 order .Order Mon 09/16 5:51 PM
FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond, on or before October 16, 2024, to12 Defendant's motion to dismiss, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/16/2024. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 09/16 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by HOLLY L. TEETER.(Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 09/16 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by HOLLY L. TEETER. Case related to Case No. 24-2354 (Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of HOLLY L. TEETER (Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
9 9 misc Errata Wed 07/24 6:15 PM
ERRATA by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA re7 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney,8 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password Thu 07/18 9:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying4 Motion for CM/ECF Password: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Password is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff does not describe his access to the internet or confirm his capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis as required by LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Plaintiff may re-file his motion and include the requested information. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/18/2024. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 07/24 6:10 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/2024.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 07/24 6:06 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2024.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 misc Errata Wed 07/24 6:03 PM
ERRATA by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA re3 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
5 5 motion CM/ECF Password Wed 07/24 5:57 PM
MOTION for CM/ECF Password by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
4 4 motion CM/ECF Password Wed 07/17 9:56 PM
MOTION for CM/ECF Password by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 07/17 9:51 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOLLY L. TEETER served on 7/12/2024(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, July 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Mon 07/08 3:36 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
service Summons Reissued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 07/08 3:40 PM
SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to HOLLY L. TEETER, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Sent to Plaintiff by email. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
service Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 06/24 4:23 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued as to HOLLY L. TEETER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against HOLLY L. TEETER ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number TBD) with Jury Demand filed by GANIYU AYINLA JAIYEOLA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet