Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 1:24-cv-02736
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Gregory Hannah-Jones
Represented By
Ethan G. Zelizer
Hr Law Counsel
contact info
Peter Andrew Lampros
Hall & Lampros, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
9 9 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 10/28 9:05 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. It is Ordered and Adjudged that the action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Mon 10/28 9:00 AM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation, Dkt. No.6 , as its opinion: the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to show proof of effective service of process and follow a lawful Order of the Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 10/25 9:09 AM
Submission of6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 10/28 9:02 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tht)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 10/07 3:49 PM
ORDER for Service of6 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/7/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 10/07 3:48 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED, without prejudice, for their failure to serve Defendant within 90 days of filing their complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(m) and pursuant to LR 41.3A(2), NDGa. for their failure to comply with an Order of the Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral of this action to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/7/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 10/07 9:07 AM
Submission of5 Order to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 09/20 9:24 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to either submit documentation that service was waived or timely effectuated or to show cause, within 14 days from the date of entry of this Order, why the complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve Defendant within 90 days of filing of the complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this matter to the undersigned Magistrate Judge at the expiration of the allotted time if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/20/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
4 4 misc Leave of Absence Wed 08/28 4:01 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 09/18/24 - 09/24/24; 02/07/25 - 02/14/25, by Peter Andrew Lampros. (Lampros, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Wed 06/26 9:14 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Ethan G. Zelizer. Clerk to follow-up by 7/8/2024. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 06/24 9:41 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. (jbu)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gregory Hannah-Jones. (Filing fee $405, receipt number CGANDC-13521539)(jbu) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet