Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Mark S Norris
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:24-cv-02438
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 2:40 AM CST
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Plaintiff
Aaron L. Lewis, III
3820 Treasure Hills Cove
Memphis, TN 38128


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sat 04/19 12:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION filed by United States Postal Service.(Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Def Initial Disclosures,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Clawback Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C First Page of eOPF
Thursday, April 17, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Replace Mediator Thu 04/17 12:28 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Replace Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on April 17, 2025. (cet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
35 35 motion Replace Mediator Wed 04/16 3:07 PM
MOTION TO REPLACE MEDIATOR proposed order submitted by United States Postal Service. (Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/07 9:36 AM
NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING IMPROPER DISCLOSURE OF THIRD-PARTY PERSONNEL REORDS & REQUEST FOR APPROPRIATE RELIEF by Aaron L. Lewis, III (jae)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/04 2:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION in Limine filed by United States Postal Service. (Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/04 1:59 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file response is April 4, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on April 4, 2025. (cet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/03 7:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION in Limine proposed order submitted by United States Postal Service.(Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Def Resp to PL Mtn in Limine
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
30 30 motion Sealed Motion Wed 04/02 12:35 PM
SEALED MOTION by Aaron L. Lewis, III. (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
29 29 motion Seal Tue 04/01 12:25 PM
MOTION to Seal Motion to toll the statue of limitation and supporting exhibits by Aaron L. Lewis, III. (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
28 28 motion In Limine Fri 03/14 3:54 PM
MOTION in Limine To Exclude The 58664 Award Document Due to Forged Signature on Cost Worksheet by Aaron L. Lewis, III. (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 8:57 AM
NOTICE of filing Rule 26(a)91)(A) initial disclosures by Aaron L. Lewis, III (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 02/28 2:18 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING25 Pro se Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Disclosures. The motion is unopposed. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to file initial disclosures is March 7, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on February 28, 2025. (cet)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/28 1:14 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Disclosures. (mf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 4:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF ADR FEES AND APPOINTING MEDIATOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on February 25, 2025. (cet)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/25 4:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on February 25, 2025. (cet)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 02/25 3:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff: Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2025. Aaron T. Lewis, III, pro se Plaintiff, and Monica Simmons-Jones, counsel for Defendant, appeared via Microsoft Teams. Case deadlines and Local Rules discussed. Scheduling order to be entered. (cet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 02/18 2:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint . (Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 notice Setting Letter - Teams Mon 02/10 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF RESETTING: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 2/25/2025 at 3:00 PM in Virtual before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Vallonda Pettway at vallonda_pettway@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(vup)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/10 3:43 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING18 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SCHEDULING ORDER AND RULE 26(F) REPORT. Though the Motion's Certificate of Consultation indicates that the Motion is opposed and Defendant's deadline to respond to the Motion has not yet passed, the Court will consider the Motion now. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to consult again and submit their Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and file their Rule 26(f) Report by February 24, 2025. The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for February 12, 2025, is RESET to February 25, 2025, at 3:00pm via Microsoft Teams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 02/10/2025. (jad)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/10 2:33 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Order and Rule 26(f) report filed by Aaron L. Lewis, III. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 02/07 8:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
16 16 notice Setting Letter - Teams Fri 01/17 3:57 PM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 02/12/2025 at 04:00 PM via Microsoft Teams before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The parties must jointly file their Rule 26(f) Report on the case docket AND email their joint proposed scheduling order in Word format by February 10, 2025. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Vallonda Pettway at vallonda_pettway@tnwd.uscourts.gov with any questions.(jad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/02 9:18 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United States Postal Service.(Simmons-Jones, Monica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 11/13 4:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 11/12/2024. (mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 11/07 1:50 PM
Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Copies of summonses, the complaint, and US Marshall form 285 were placed in the Interoffice Mailbox of US Marshall Service in order to effect service.(mf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/06 1:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO ISSUE AND EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on November 6, 2024. (cet)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/01 1:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron L. Lewis, III. (jae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/20 9:21 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SECOND IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT OR PAY THE CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 08/20/2024. (jad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Mon 06/24 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice LR 16.2 Mon 06/24 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice ADR Compliance Mon 06/24 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/24 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Signed Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by Aaron L. Lewis, III (agj)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/24 10:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron L. Lewis, III. (agj)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/24 10:38 AM
Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Mon 06/24 10:36 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service, filed by Aaron L. Lewis, III.(agj)
Related: [-]