North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00199
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 25, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (1)
Represented By
STACEY D. RUBAIN
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GRAHAM TOD GREEN
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/25/2024 4:13 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (1). (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
Arrest of JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. on 6/7/2024. (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Initial Appearance as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. held on 6/7/2024. Defendant advised of rights and charges. (SAUSA Lauren Martin; AFPD Mireille Clough appeared on behalf of AFPD Stacey Rubain for defendant JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR.; Proceedings Recorded) (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
Oral Motion for Detention by USA as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
3 3 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/7/2024 in case as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (sh) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Appointing Assistant Federal Public Defender STACEY D. RUBAIN for JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/7/2024. (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ORDER SCHEDULING DETENTION HEARING AND PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. Detention Hearing/Preliminary Examination set for 6/14/2024 02:30 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/7/2024. (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
7 7 SEALED Pretrial Services Report as to Defendant JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. (mew). [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
8 8 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: PRELIMINARY AND DETENTION HEARING as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR. held on 6/14/2024 (see Exhibit/Witness List). For the reasons stated from the bench, the Court does find probable cause to support the alleged charges in the complaint and the Government's motion for detention is granted; the defendant shall be held in custody pending further proceedings in this case; Order of Detention forthcoming. (AUSA Ashley Waid; Counsel for defendant AFPD Stacey Rubain; Proceedings Recorded) (dk) [1:24-mj-00230-JEP]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
9 9 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to JOSEPH LEE GRIER, JR (1) count(s) 1, 2. (at)
Related: [-]