Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:24-cv-01830
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12111 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:17 AM EST
Defendant
Thomas Jefferson University
Represented By
Benjamin S. Teris
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Amy Epstein Gluck
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Sidney R Steinberg
Pierson Ferdinand, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol Goddard
Represented By
Megan S. Goddard
Goddard Law PLLC
contact info
Lucrecia Patrice Johnson
Lpj Legal PLLC
contact info
Frances Codd Slusarz
Goddard Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/19 2:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Frances Codd Slusarz terminated. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 3/19/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/05 1:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Carol Goddard(Slusarz, Frances)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
25 25 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Fri 01/31 2:45 PM
QC NOTICE:24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Carol Goddard needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/31 10:04 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Megan S. Goddard (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11739668.) by Carol Goddard(Johnson, Lucrecia)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/13 2:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas Jefferson University.(Gluck, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/05 5:17 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Carol Goddard.(Slusarz, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Goddard Declaration
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 11/14 8:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Thomas Jefferson University(Gluck, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. B - Declaration of R.J. Toy,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/24 12:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/24/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 10/24 11:10 AM
Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/24/2024 before Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. (FTR - Gomez - 4B) (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 9:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin S. Teris. Directing attorney Benjamin S. Teris to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/23 3:18 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin S. Teris (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11566692.) by Thomas Jefferson University(Gluck, Amy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/23 4:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sidney R Steinberg. Directing attorney Sidney R Steinberg to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/21 3:47 PM
ORDER Scheduling a Telephonic Status Conference on Thursday, October 24, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. Eastern Time. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/21/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 7:56 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sidney R. Steinberg (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11555936.) by Thomas Jefferson University(Gluck, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit CERTIFICATION OF AMY EPSTEIN GLUCK, ESQUIRE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT SIDNEY R. STEINBERG, ESQUIRE PRO HAC VICE
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 7:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Epstein Gluck on behalf of Thomas Jefferson University (Gluck, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 misc Request for Pre-Motion Conference Mon 09/16 6:44 PM
Request for Pre-Motion Conference (Gluck, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/22 7:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carol Goddard. Thomas Jefferson University waiver sent on 7/17/2024, answer due 9/16/2024.(Slusarz, Frances)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/18 11:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frances Codd Slusarz. Directing attorney Frances Codd Slusarz to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Wed 07/17 3:03 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for FRANCES CODD SLUSARZ by Carol Goddard. The fee has already been paid.(Johnson, Lucrecia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
8 8 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Tue 07/16 11:23 AM
QC NOTICE:7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Carol Goddard needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/15 5:56 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for FRANCES CODD SLUSARZ (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11373904.) by Carol Goddard(Johnson, Lucrecia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 order Case Management Order Wed 07/10 10:43 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 7/10/2024. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/09 4:10 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/25 1:40 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Thomas Jefferson University.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Tue 06/25 1:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/25/2024. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Thomas Jeffeson University or counsel for Thomas Jeffeson University are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/9/2024. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/25 8:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Thomas Jefferson University ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11336382.), filed by Carol Goddard.(Johnson, Lucrecia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 06/25 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Thomas Jeffeson University or counsel for Thomas Jeffeson University are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/9/2024. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]