Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-40167

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Grant
Case #: 4:24-bk-40168
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC
3535 Brady Lane
Lafayette, IN 47909
Represented By
Sarah L. Fowler
Blackwell, Burke & Ramsey, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
26 26 order Amended Order Wed 07/31 3:34 PM
Amended Order for Joint Administration Related [+]. (mjc)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
Sunday, July 21, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Mon 07/22 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Mon 07/22 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Docket Entry
Saturday, July 20, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 07/21 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice to Additional Creditors
Friday, July 19, 2024
22 22 court Docket Entry(BK) Fri 07/19 2:14 PM
Docket Entry - An order has been entered jointly administering this case with the case of Maximus Supply Chain Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-40167 for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. Except for the lists, schedules, statements and other documents required by Rule 1007, which shall be filed in paper, and claims, all motions, pleadings, orders, papers, and other documents must be filed, docketed, and processed in case no. 24-40167 Related [+]. (jas)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
21 21 order Joint Administration Fri 07/19 2:02 PM
Order For Joint Administration Related [+] (jas)
Related: [-] 2 First Day Motion for Joint Administration
Thursday, July 18, 2024
20 20 notice Notice to Additional Creditors Thu 07/18 9:32 AM
Notice to Additional Creditors. (sed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/17 3:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC Related [+] (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Amendment filed by Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Amendment Tue 07/16 12:25 PM
First Notice of Amendment Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC Related [+] (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
17 17 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 07/16 12:23 PM
Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders , Amendment to List of Creditors & Verification. . Fee Amount $34, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Attorney Fee Disclosure Tue 07/16 10:25 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $47,380.00 Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Statement of Insider Compensation Tue 07/16 10:24 AM
Statement of Insider Compensation Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 07/16 12:24 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors & Verification([LINK 24-40168 reg] ) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A24752342, amount $ 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#17
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance(BK) Wed 07/10 1:02 PM
Notice of Appearance by Annette England Filed by Creditor PACCAR Financial Corp. (England, Annette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance(BK) Tue 07/09 6:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices by Kenneth D. Peters Filed by Creditor M&T Equipment Finance Corporation (Peters, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 04, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 07/05 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 File
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 07/05 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Related [+]. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
10 10 order File Tue 07/02 12:54 PM
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing a Plan or a Progress Report . Plan due by 11/25/2024. (mjc)
Related: [-]
9 9 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 07/02 12:22 PM
Section 341 Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/26/2024 at 01:30 PM via Telephonic Meeting with US Trustee Trial Attorney. Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 9/24/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 10/24/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/23/2024. (mjc)
Related: [-]
utility Set Missing Document Deadline Tue 07/02 12:48 PM
Deadline for Missing Documents Set.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/25/2024. (mjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 06/29 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice Re Debtor in Possession
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance(BK) Thu 06/27 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance by Michael E. DiRienzo Filed by Creditor Tempus Maximus, LLC (DiRienzo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/26 3:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC Related [+] (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Motion (Certificate of Service) filed by Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC
5 5 notice Notice Re Debtor in Possession Wed 06/26 1:51 PM
Notice of status as, and obligations of, Debtor-in-Possession in Chapter 11. (mjc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Motion Wed 06/26 8:17 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Motion Debtor's First Day Motion for Joint Administration with Certificate of Service Filed Separately Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC Related [+] (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC
Att: 1 Motion for Joint Administration
court Related Bankruptcy Wed 06/26 12:11 PM
Related BK Case(s): Case No: 24-40167 ,Chp: 11,Date Filed: 06/25/2024,. Case No: 24-40169 ,Chp: 11,Date Filed: 6/25/2024, . Case No: 24-40170 , Chp: 11,Date Filed: 6/25/2024,. Case No: 24-40171 ,Chp: 11,Date Filed: 6/25/2024,. Case No: 24-40172 ,Chp: 11,Date Filed: 6/25/2024,. Case No: 24-40173 ,Chp: 11,Date Filed: 6/25/2024,. Case No: 24-40174 ,Chp: 11,Date Filed: 6/25/2024,. (mjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance(BK) Tue 06/25 1:08 PM
Notice of Appearance by Brian Tuinenga Filed by U.S. Trustee Nancy J. Gargula (Tuinenga, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Tue 06/25 12:59 PM
Debtors' First Day Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor 1 Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC (Fowler, Sarah) Modified on 6/26/2024 (mjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 06/25 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Chapter 11 List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders, List of Equity Security Holders, and Verification of Creditor Matrix . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Maximus Logistics Solutions, LLC. (Fowler, Sarah) Modified on 6/26/2024 (mjc)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/25 12:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40168 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A24695337, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Set Missing Document Deadline Wed 06/26 1:47 PM
Deadline for Missing Documents Set. Schedule A/B due 7/9/2024. Schedule D due 7/9/2024. Schedule E/F due 7/9/2024. Schedule G due 7/9/2024. Schedule H due 7/9/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/9/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/9/2024. (mjc)
Related: [-]