Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:24-cv-11641
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Case in other court:16th Circuit Court, Macomb County, 24-001995-NF
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:31 AM EST
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
King, Tilden, McEttrick & Brink, P.C. 38777 Six Mile Rd, Ste. 314
Livonia, MI 48152
Represented By
Michael Wisniewski
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink
contact info
Stephanie M.S. Tompkin
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michigan Ambulatory Surgical Center, LLC
as Assignee of Lenajae Clay Anthony, Paulovich & Worrall, PLLC 835 Mason Street, Ste. C220
Dearborn, MI 48124
Represented By
Jarrod Anthony
Anthony, Paulovich & Worrall, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
13 13 trial Witness List Mon 05/12 12:09 PM
WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Anthony, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
notice Error Thu 09/05 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Jarrod Anthony re12 Discovery Plan - Rule 26f. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SHic)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 09/04 4:14 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Anthony, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
11 11 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Tue 09/03 5:44 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Anthony, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
10 10 order Protective Order Tue 08/27 3:26 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE AND CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/26 4:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/26/2025 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/28/2025 Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2025 01:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 12/9/2025 09:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. Related [+] (LSau)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 08/26 9:19 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference Hearing on August 26, 2024 is Cancelled re6 Notice to Appear (LSau)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 notice Appearance Thu 08/15 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jarrod Anthony on behalf of Michigan Ambulatory Surgical Center, LLC. (Anthony, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 08/12 6:23 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Tompkin, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
6 6 notice Appear* Tue 07/23 4:35 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2024 10:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/28 1:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company. (Tompkin, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 06/25 3:00 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie M.S. Tompkin appearing on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Tompkin, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 06/25 2:55 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (Wisniewski, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 06/25 2:51 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Wisniewski appearing on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Wisniewski, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Tue 06/25 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from 16th Judicial Circuit Court, Macomb County, case number 2024-001995-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9841434 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Wisniewski, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Annual Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Billing Records,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet