Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gail A Weilheimer
Case #: 2:24-cv-02771
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
NMS LABS, INC.
200 Welsh Road
Horsham, PA 19044
Represented By
MARIE T. SARKEES
Bunker & Ray
contact info
Plaintiff
KAYLYNN CARTWRIGHT
201 E. Germantown Pike, APT 112
East Norriton, PA 19401
Represented By
MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY
Law Offices Of Eric A Shore PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 02/28 11:04 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 2/28/25. 2/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/28 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER Settlement Conference held on 2/26/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/20 11:47 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE: The Settlement Conference currently scheduled for February 26, 2025 at 10:00 AM (ECF17 ) will take place in Courtroom 7-B.(rt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
18 18 minutes Status Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 02/11 10:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER Status Conference held on 2/10/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/10 3:39 PM
ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN 2/21/25 EACH COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE TO CHAMBERS VIA EMAIL TO CHAMBERS_WEIHLHEIMER@PAED.USCOURTS.GOV A CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/26/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom TBD. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 2/10/25. 2/10/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/24 3:40 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE: A Status Conference is scheduled for Monday, February 10, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. with Judge Gail Weilheimer. The conference will be conducted via the ZoomGov platform. Login information will be provided to counsel by email. Lead trial counsel is required to attend the conference. If trial counsel is on trial in another matter, an attorney in his or her office who is thoroughly familiar with and prepared to discuss the substance, settlement and scheduling of this case is required to attend the Conference. Counsel should be prepared to discuss the strengths and weaknesses of the case and be completely conversant with the essential issues and facts.(rt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/17 1:07 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ TO DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/17/25. 1/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 01/14 3:39 PM
ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/12/2025., MOTIONS DUE BY 6/2/2025., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 10/13/2025., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/5/2025 10:30 AM IN Courtroom 6A; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/26/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 6A; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/3/2025., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/3/2025., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 12/19/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 1/14/25. 1/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/14 3:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 discov Discovery Plan Tue 01/07 2:42 PM
Discovery Plan by NMS LABS, INC..(SARKEES, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/15 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/14/2025 02:30 PM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ. 11/15/2024 (Mountney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Tue 09/17 3:40 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NMS LABS, INC.. (SARKEES, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 6:11 PM
Defendant NMS' ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by NMS LABS, INC..(SARKEES, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/23 2:24 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO A DATE 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 8/23/24. 8/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 08/23 1:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by NMS LABS, INC.. (SARKEES, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 07/03 9:49 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NMS LABS, INC..(SARKEES, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/01 2:49 PM
ORDERED THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/1/24. 7/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/01 2:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAYLYNN CARTWRIGHT. NMS LABS, INC. waiver sent on 6/26/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/28 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARIE T. SARKEES on behalf of NMS LABS, INC. (SARKEES, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 06/26 11:49 AM
Summons Issued as to NMS LABS, INC.. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/26/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 06/25 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against NMS LABS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17560737.), filed by KAYLYNN CARTWRIGHT.(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit