New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:24-cv-01714
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 26, 2024 11:04 PM EDT
Defendant
C.O.s
Defendant
Medical Nurses for Wellpath of O.C.J.
Defendant
Orange County Jail
Defendant
Wellpath Health Services
Plaintiff
Robert Pearson
ID: 2024-00169 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Rd.
Goshen, NY 10924


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Processed Wed 03/19 9:05 AM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of docket sheet to Robert Pearson #24-B-5229 at Elmira C.F., PO Box 500, Elmira, NY 14902-0500 on 03/19/2025. (sov)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
41 41 misc Letter Tue 03/18 6:46 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Robert Pearson dated 3/17/2025 re: The reason for me sending this letter to the Court is because, I ask the Court for help with a pro bono Lawyer! Document filed by Robert Pearson, Robert Pearson. (jjc)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Received Tue 03/18 6:47 PM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Received: Re (41 in 7:24-cv-01657-KMK, 41 in 7:24-cv-01714-KMK) Letter,. Request for Docket Report, from Robert Pearson received on 3/17/2025. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
43 43 misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Received Tue 03/25 1:35 PM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Received: Re (42 in 7:24-cv-01657-KMK, 42 in 7:24-cv-01714-KMK, 17 in 7:24-cv-08254-KMK, 10 in 1:24-cv-08695-LTS, 12 in 1:24-cv-08693-LTS) Letter,. Request for Docket Report, from Robert Pearson received on 3/10/2025. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (jjc)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Letter Tue 03/25 1:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Clerk of Court from Robert Pearson dated 3/10/2025 re: The reason for me Sending This letter to the Cart is because, I file some Civil lawsuits back in The year 2024,... I'm asking for a Copy of every Civil Lawsuit I have in Court. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (jjc)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Letter Tue 03/11 10:18 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Robert Pearson dated 2/27/2025 re: The reason for me sending this to the Court is because, I sent a letter to the Court asking about a Pro Bono Lawyer for these 2 Cases! At the time the Court said something about the Court can not put me on the Pro Bono list at the time as further described herein. Document filed by Robert Pearson, Robert Pearson. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Wed 02/26 7:55 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Robert Pearson dated 1/14/2025 re: I ask the Court about a pro bono lawyer to help me with my lawsuit. Document filed by Robert Pearson.(rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 01/22 2:14 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 38. Mailed to: Robert Pearson DIN#24B5229 Elmira Correctional Facility P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14902-0500. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
38 38 7 pgs order Order Tue 01/21 12:40 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's request is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew this request and provide the Court with additional information regarding his circumstances if they materially change. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/21/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Mon 12/30 9:36 AM
LETTER from Robert Pearson dated 12/21/2024 re: The reason for me sending this to the Court is because I'm asking The Clerk of the Court to put these two cases up for a pro bono lawyer to help me with the case. Also I'm letting the Court know I have a new address: Robert Pearson DIN #24B5229 Elmira Correctional Facility P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14902-0500. Document filed by Robert Pearson.(km) Modified on 12/30/2024 (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
36 36 misc Letter Wed 12/18 3:20 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Robert Pearson dated 12/8/2024 re: The reason for me sending this to the Court is because, I will like to first ask the Court for help as further set forth herein. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 12/11 11:32 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
35 35 order Memo Endorsement Tue 12/10 12:39 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:34 Letter received legal mail from Barclay Damon LLP law farm filed by Robert Pearson. ENDORSEMENT: The Court cannot stop Wellpath from filing for bankruptcy or from seeking a stay. The bankruptcy proceedings will initially play out in the bankruptcy court. In terms of representation, Mr. Pearson may submit a formal request for appointment of pro bono counsel and the Court will consider it in due course The Clerk is respectfully directed to mail this document to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/10/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Fri 12/06 9:49 AM
LETTER from Robert Pearson dated 11/29/2024 re: the reason for me sending this to your court room is because I got some legal mail from Barclay Damon LLP law farm. Document filed by Robert Pearson..(nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
33 33 misc Letter Wed 12/04 11:49 AM
LETTER addressed to Clerk of Court from Robert Pearson dated 11/28/2024 re: Defendants filing bankruptcy and requests for pro bono assistance with cases. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (ar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Processed Wed 11/27 9:53 AM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of docket sheet to Robert Pearson #2024-01650 at Orange County Jail, 110 Wells Farm Road, Goshen, NY 10924 on 11/27/2024. (sov)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Received Tue 11/26 3:44 PM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Received: Re (30 in 7:24-cv-01714-KMK) Letter, (31 in 7:24-cv-01657-KMK) Letter, (5 in 1:24-cv-08254-LTS) Letter, (97 in 7:22-cv-09278-PMH) Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Robert Pearson received on 11/22/2024. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
32 32 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 11/19 1:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Stay served on Robert Pearson, Jr. on 11/19/2024. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Wellpath Health Services..(Sanders, Paul)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Tue 11/19 1:44 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Wellpath Health Services . Document filed by Wellpath Health Services.(Sanders, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stay Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Fri 11/01 2:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Clerk Pro-Se from Robert Pearson dated 10/21/2024 re: How many cases currently in the court and copy of documents. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (ar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 10/25 11:03 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 29. Mailed to: Robert Pearson ID:2024-00169 Orange County Correctional Facility 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. (tn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
29 29 order Memo Endorsement Thu 10/24 9:49 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:27 Letter filed by Orange County. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk is asked to note the new address for Mr. Pearson. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/23/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Thu 10/24 4:29 PM
Mailed a copy of28 Letter (Docket Sheet) to Robert Pearson, ID: 2024-00169, Orange County Correctional Facility, 110 Wells Farm Rd., Goshen, NY 10924. (vn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Wed 10/23 2:43 PM
LETTER addressed to Clerk of Court from Robert Pearson dated 10/13/2024 re: missing pages and case update. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (tp)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Wed 10/23 12:44 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Dante De Leo dated 10/23/2024 re: Update of Plaintiff's Address. Document filed by Orange County..(De Leo, Dante)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court Wed 10/23 2:44 PM
Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re:28 Letter, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 10/09 9:16 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 26. Mailed to: Robert Pearson ID:2024-00169 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
26 26 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/08 2:28 PM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Granted. The Clerk is respectfully directed to mail this document to Plaintiff. So Ordered. (All Defendants.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/8/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/04 12:15 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Dante De Leo dated 10/4/2024. Document filed by Orange County..(De Leo, Dante)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
misc Received Returned Mail Wed 10/02 12:52 PM
Received returned mail re:21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mail was addressed to Robert Pearson of Orange County Jail at 110 Wells Farm Rd., Goshen, NY 10924 and was returned for the following reason(s): Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 09/20 2:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Robert Pearson on 9/20/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Orange County..(De Leo, Dante)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dante David De Leo on behalf of Orange County..(De Leo, Dante)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 09/20 1:23 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/19 12:03 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Granted. So Ordered. (Jane Doe Nurse answer due 10/15/2024; John Doe E.R.T. Officer 1 answer due 10/15/2024; John Doe E.R.T. Officer 2 answer due 10/15/2024; John Doe Lieutenant answer due 10/15/2024; John Doe Sergeant answer due 10/15/2024; Orange County answer due 10/15/2024; Wellpath Health Services answer due 10/15/2024.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/19/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
20 20 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 09/18 4:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance and letter to Judge Karas requesting extension of time to answer served on Robert Pearson, Jr. on September 18, 2024. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Wellpath Health Services..(Sanders, Paul)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/18 4:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Paul A. Sanders dated September 18, 2024. Document filed by Wellpath Health Services..(Sanders, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Andrew Sanders on behalf of Wellpath Health Services..(Sanders, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
22 22 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Thu 09/19 3:54 PM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Wellpath Health Services served on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
17 17 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Tue 09/17 3:36 PM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Wellpath Health Services served on 8/21/2024, answer due 9/11/2024. Service was accepted by Nicole Kaye Mental Health Director at 110 Wells Farm Road Goshen, NY 10924. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (jjc)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Tue 09/17 3:34 PM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Orange County served on 8/20/2024, answer due 9/10/2024. Service was accepted by Carol Pierce Deputy County Attorney at Orange County Government Center 255 Main Street Goshen, NY 10924. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
15 15 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Tue 09/17 11:20 AM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Orange County served on 8/15/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Other Mon 08/26 12:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copy of 8/23/24 letter to Judge Karas re: County's Response to Court's Order of Service served on Robert Pearson on 8/26/2424. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Orange County..(De Leo, Dante)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Fri 08/23 4:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Dante De Leo dated 8/23/2024 re: In response to the Order of Service dated June 28, 2024. Document filed by Orange County..(De Leo, Dante)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
12 12 misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed Wed 07/10 9:20 AM
INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Robert Pearson ID: 2024-00169 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924, at, on 7/10/2024 Re:10 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (aan)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 07/10 9:16 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orange County, Wellpath Medical Services. (aan)
Related: [-]
misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M. Wed 07/10 9:18 AM
FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 7/10/2024 Re: Judge Kenneth M. Karas10 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Orange County, Wellpath Medical Services. (aan)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Wed 07/10 9:21 AM
Mailed a copy of10 Order of Service,1 Complaint to Orange County Attorney at: 255 Main Street, Goshen, NY 10924. (aan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
10 10 15 pgs order Order of Service ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 06/28 4:35 PM
ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the Orange County Jail. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to replace: (1) the Orange County Jail with Orange County; and (2) All the nurses that had something to do with this and "All the C.O. officers that had something to do with this" with Jane Doe Nurse, John Doe E.R.T. Officer 1, John DoeE.R.T. Officer 2, John Doe Sergeant, and John Doe Lieutenant as defendants in this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to the Orange County Attorney at: 255 Main Street, Goshen, NY 10924. The Clerk of Court is also directed to issue summonses for Defendants Wellpath Medical Services and Orange County, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service.The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is instructed to mail an information package to Plaintiff.SO ORDERED., (Orange County, Jane Doe Nurse, John Doe E.R.T. Officer 1, John Doe E.R.T. Officer 2, John Doe Sergeant and John Doe Lieutenant added. Orange County Jail, C.O.s (All the C.O.s officers that had something to do with this.) and Medical Nurses for Wellpath of O.C.J. (All the nurses that had something to do with this.) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/28/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
utility Case Accepted as Related Tue 06/25 10:58 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:24-cv-01657-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 06/25 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 06/25 11:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Robert Pearson..(rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/29/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
6 6 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Robert Pearson..(rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Robert Pearson ID:2024-00169 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. (nb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
5 5 ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to remail a copy of the Court's March 8, 2024 order (ECF 3), along with a blank prisoner authorization form and a copy of this order, to Plaintiff at his address of record. The Court grants Plaintiff an extension of time to comply with the March 8, 2024 order. Within 30 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $405.00 in filing fees or submit a completed prisoner authorization. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/3/2024) (mml) Modified on 5/7/2024 (mml).
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Robert Pearson dated 4/24/2024 re: status of three new cases. Document filed by Robert Pearson..(rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Received returned mail re:3 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization,,. Mail was addressed to Robert Pearson ID:2024-00169 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender..(rdz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Robert Pearson ID:2024-00169 Orange County Jail 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. (rdz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 4/8/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/8/2024) (sha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
2 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against C.O.s, Medical Nurses for Wellpath of O.C.J., Orange County Jail, Wellpath Health Services. Document filed by Robert Pearson. (sac)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]