New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Referred: Michael J Roemer
Case #: 1:24-cv-00592
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 4:47 AM EST
Defendant
Capital Management Services, L.P.
Represented By
Mark A. Moldenhauer
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Kevin George Cope
Kevin Cope (pro Bono)
contact info
Defendant
Center One, LLC
Represented By
Mark A. Moldenhauer
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Kevin George Cope
Kevin Cope (pro Bono)
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa Hill
Represented By
Robert L. Mullin
Ferr And Mullin
contact info
Robert Eugene DeRose
Barkan Meizlish Handleman Goodin Derose Wentz, LLP
contact info
Hans A. Nilges
Nilges Draher
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa A. Phillips
Represented By
Robert L. Mullin
Ferr And Mullin
contact info
Robert Eugene DeRose
Barkan Meizlish Handleman Goodin Derose Wentz, LLP
contact info
Hans A. Nilges
Nilges Draher
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin R. Stoot
Represented By
Robert L. Mullin
Ferr And Mullin
contact info
Robert Eugene DeRose
Barkan Meizlish Handleman Goodin Derose Wentz, LLP
contact info
Hans A. Nilges
Nilges Draher
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
44 44 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 03/03 8:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: Robert E. DeRose, Esq. and David Manes, Esq. on behalf of plaintiffs; Kevin G. Cope, Esq. on behalf of defendants. Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2025 re 41 MOTION Amended Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Vanessa Hill, Lisa A. Phillips, Robin R. Stoot. The Court considered the matter submitted for decision/report and recommendation. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/12 12:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re41 MOTION Amended Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips, Vanessa Hill.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-0103 (01 31-2025 Fulton Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
42 42 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/05 4:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re41 MOTION Amended Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Center One, LLC, Capital Management Services, L.P.. (Cope, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/14 2:00 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE as to41 MOTION Amended Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/5/2025. Replies due by 2/19/2025. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 11:30 AM in Allegany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/14 2:12 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING NOTICE as to41 MOTION Amended Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/5/2025. Replies due by 2/19/2025. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 11:30 AM in Allegany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/13 2:51 PM
MOTION Amended Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips, Vanessa Hill.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice for Opt-in Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Robin Stoot Declaration
40 40 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/13 10:52 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center One, LLC, Capital Management Services, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Capital Management Services Group, Inc. for Capital Management Services, L.P., Center One, LLC.. (Cope, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Continue Thu 01/02 2:12 PM
TEXT ORDER. In light of the Amended Complaint34 and plaintiffs' motion38 indicating that they intend to amend their motion for conditional certification and court supervised notice, the pending motion for conditional certification28 is dismissed as moot and without prejudice. The motion hearing scheduled for 1/8/2025 is hereby CANCELLED. Plaintiffs shall file an amended motion for conditional certification on or before 1/24/2025. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/2/2025. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Continue Thu 01/02 12:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue January 8, 2025 Hearing by Robin R. Stoot.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Thu 01/02 11:37 AM
E-Filing Notification regarding37 LETTER: this document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event.(SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Tue 12/31 1:17 PM
Letter filed by Robin R. Stoot on behalf of all parties seeking to change the January 8, 2025 hearing to a telephonic status conference . (DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
36 36 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/17 10:45 AM
ANSWER to34 Amended Complaint by Center One, LLC, Capital Management Services, L.P..(Moldenhauer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/13 2:50 PM
NOTICE by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips Of Filing Consent To Join Forms Pursuant To 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
34 34 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 11:23 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capital Management Services Group, Inc., filed by Vanessa Hill, Lisa A. Phillips, Robin R. Stoot.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 12/06 8:47 AM
TEXT ORDER granting31 Motion to Amend or Correct16 Amended Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips, Vanessa Hill. Second Amended Complaint to be filed no later than 12/13/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 12/6/2024. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/02 4:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION Conditional Certification and Court Supervised Notice filed by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips, Vanessa Hill. (DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Amend/Correct Mon 12/02 4:06 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Amended Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips, Vanessa Hill.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Lodged Second Amended Complaint
Friday, November 15, 2024
30 30 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/15 1:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re28 MOTION Conditional Certification and Court Supervised Notice filed by Capital Management Services Group, Inc..(Cope, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Declaration of Danny Walker,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jason Siwek,
Att: 4 Declaration of Cory Magnuson
Sunday, November 10, 2024
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Sun 11/10 4:07 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE as to28 MOTION Conditional Certification and Court Supervised Notice. Responses due by 12/2/2024. Replies due by 12/16/2024. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2025 01:30 PM in Allegany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
29 29 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 3:18 PM
TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (AMENDED) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/4/2024. (ZHM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/01 12:22 PM
MOTION Conditional Certification and Court Supervised Notice by Robin R. Stoot, Lisa A. Phillips, Vanessa Hill.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice for Opt-In Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Arianna McDowell,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Kaylee Vander Ploeg,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Kelly Gantt,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Lisa Phillips,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Megan Kolb,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Vanessa Hill,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Toni Brown
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
27 27 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/22 12:52 PM
NOTICE by Vanessa Hill, Lisa A. Phillips, Robin R. Stoot OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Friday, October 18, 2024
26 26 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/18 11:44 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Mandatory Disclosures due by 11/8/2024. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 12/6/2024. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 1/7/2025. First Mediation Session due by 3/7/2025. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/18/2024. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 10:50 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Management Services Group, Inc.. (Cope, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
utility Remark Tue 10/15 4:36 PM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/10 4:23 PM
NOTICE by Vanessa Hill, Lisa A. Phillips, Robin R. Stoot OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/10 3:56 PM
NOTICE by Vanessa Hill, Lisa A. Phillips, Robin R. Stoot OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/07 11:50 AM
NOTICE by Vanessa Hill, Lisa A. Phillips, Robin R. Stoot OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Thursday, September 12, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order Thu 09/12 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER. The parties are hereby directed to jointly complete and email to chambers at roemer@nywd.uscourts.gov, the attached case management order. Such shall be completed within 30 days of the date of this Text Order. The Court will issue a final case management order upon receipt and review of the proposed deadlines. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/12/2024. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
19 19 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/11 3:12 PM
TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/11/2024. (ZHM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/06 5:05 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by Capital Management Services Group, Inc..(Moldenhauer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
17 17 order Text Order Mon 08/12 12:31 PM
This docket entry was issued in error. Modified on 8/12/2024 (DJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
16 16 24 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/09 1:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capital Management Services Group, Inc., filed by Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot.(DeRose, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/26 11:51 AM
NOTICE by Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form
Monday, July 22, 2024
utility Remark Mon 07/22 11:26 AM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 order Text Order Fri 07/19 11:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: The13 stipulation for an extension of time for the defendant to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the complaint until 9/13/2024 is SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/19/2024. (CRT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 07/18 2:52 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint Defendant's Time To Respond to Complaint by Capital Management Services Group, Inc.. (Cope, Kevin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/18 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin George Cope on behalf of Capital Management Services Group, Inc. (Cope, Kevin)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/18 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Moldenhauer on behalf of Capital Management Services Group, Inc. (Moldenhauer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/11 1:15 PM
NOTICE by Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/11 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hans A. Nilges on behalf of Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot (Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/10 2:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Jerry Noller on June 28, 2024, filed by Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot. (Mullin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
7 7 order Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 07/08 11:57 AM
TEXT ORDER DENYING AS MOOT6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Robert DeRose, Esq. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/8/2024. (CMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
utility E-Filing Notification Tue 07/02 11:13 AM
E-Filing Notification:6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Robert DeRose, Esq. Attorney Robert Eurgene DeRose is confirmed as a fully admitted attorney to the WDNY, admitted January 26, 2016 in Buffalo. Contact the Court's finance department to inquire about pro hac vice admission refund. (DDS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/28 10:43 AM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice Robert DeRose, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5219601.) by Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot.(Mullin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Sponsor Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Attorney Oath,
Att: 4 Exhibit Database Registration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Civility Principles
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 06/26 11:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Capital Management Services Group, Inc. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
4 4 service Original Summons Filed Tue 06/25 2:41 PM
Original Summons Filed. (Mullin, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/25 1:36 PM
Case assigned to Judge Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 06/25 1:37 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TF)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 06/25 1:37 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(TF)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Tue 06/25 2:29 PM
E-Filing Notification: re2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS - Attorney is directed to re-file submit for issuance, please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. Please have the correct case number on the Summons. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
3 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS, Exhibits A and B to1 Complaint - CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert L. Mullin on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Mullin, Robert) Modified on 6/25/2024 (TF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Party Plaintiff
2 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet & Summons .(Mullin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
E-Filing Notification: re1 COMPLAINT against Capital Management Services Group, Inc.. Action required: e-file civil cover sheet and summonses using event continuation of exhibits and link to1 Complaint, once that is entered a Judge will be assigned. (TF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 23, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Management Services Group, Inc. $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5213530, filed by Lisa Phillips, Robin Stoot.(Mullin, Robert)
Related: [-]