California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-01403
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 2:30 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Yun Louise Lu
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
TCL Mobile Communication HK Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Yun Louise Lu
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
TCT Mobile US Inc.
Represented By
Yun Louise Lu
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Wi-LAN Inc.
Represented By
Janson Westmoreland
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
John P. Murphy
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Jonathan H. Rastegar
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Edward R Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Ryan E. Hatch
Hatch Law PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Wi-LAN Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Janson Westmoreland
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
John P. Murphy
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Jonathan H. Rastegar
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Edward R Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Ryan E. Hatch
Hatch Law PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Wi-LAN USA, Inc.
Represented By
Janson Westmoreland
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
John P. Murphy
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Jonathan H. Rastegar
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Edward R Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Ryan E. Hatch
Hatch Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Yun Louise Lu
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
TCL Mobile Communication HK Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Yun Louise Lu
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
TCT Mobile US Inc.
Represented By
Yun Louise Lu
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wi-LAN Inc.
Represented By
Janson Westmoreland
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
John P. Murphy
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Jonathan H. Rastegar
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Edward R Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Ryan E. Hatch
Hatch Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wi-LAN USA, Inc.
Represented By
Janson Westmoreland
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
John P. Murphy
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Jonathan H. Rastegar
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Edward R Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Ryan E. Hatch
Hatch Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wi-LAN Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Janson Westmoreland
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
John P. Murphy
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Jonathan H. Rastegar
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Edward R Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC
contact info
Ryan E. Hatch
Hatch Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
37 37 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Tue 02/11 3:30 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dismissal Order
36 36 order Dismissing Case Tue 02/11 3:26 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL35 by Judge James V. Selna, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the Joint Stipulation of the parties, the claims brought by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc., and Wi-LAN Labs, Inc. on the one hand, and Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and TCL Mobile Communication (HK) Co., Ltd., on the other hand, shall be dismissed WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
35 35 stip Dismiss Case Mon 02/10 8:19 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc..(Nelson, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/04 2:18 PM
ORDER REGARDING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO DISMISS CASE33 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties shall have until noon on Monday, February 10, 2025 to dismiss this case with prejudice. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
33 33 stip Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/03 3:42 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents filed by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc..(Nelson, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 08/21 2:09 PM
ORDER REGARDING JOINT NOTICE OF RESOLUTION AND STIPULATION TO STAY CASE31 by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all deadlines in Case No.: 8:24-cv-01403-JVS-ADS are STAYED pending Defendants' final payment pursuant the parties' settlement agreement, which is due no later than January 31, 2025. Upon Plaintiffs' receipt of Defendants' final payment, the parties shall dismiss this case with prejudice within three days, or by Monday, February 3, 2025, whichever is earlier. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all current deadlines and settings in this case are VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es)
Related: [-]
31 31 stip Stay Case Wed 08/21 9:36 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending settlement filed by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc..(Nelson, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
30 30 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 07/30 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying TCL Communication (BVI) Limited, TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Limited, Alpha Alliance Enterprises Limited, TCL Mobile (US) Holdings Inc., and Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.. (Lu, Yun)
Related: [-]
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim Tue 07/30 5:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendants TCL Mobile Communication HK Co., Ltd., TCT Mobile US Inc., Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd..(Lu, Yun)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
28 28 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/09 4:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULE AND OTHER ISSUES27 by Judge James V. Selna. The Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. The following schedule is hereby entered for the conduct of the case through trial: Trial is set for 4/03/2026 at 8:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference; Hearings on Motions in Limine set for 3/20/2026 at 11:00 a.m. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.] (es)
Related: [-]
27 27 7 pgs stip Order Tue 07/09 11:59 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Proposed Case Schedule and Other Issues filed by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc..(Nelson, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
26 26 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 07/08 2:50 PM
Text Only Order GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.,20 by Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
25 25 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 07/05 10:28 AM
Text Only Order GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Janson Westmoreland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.,19 by Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
24 24 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 07/05 10:25 AM
Text Only Order GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.,18 by Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 07/05 10:24 AM
Text Only Order GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.,17 by Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
22 22 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 07/05 10:20 AM
Text Only Order GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Edward R. Nelson III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.,16 by Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 07/05 9:35 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/03 4:28 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37774991) filed by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Supreme Court of Texas Certification,
Att: 2 Supplement Texas Bar Certification,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Pro Hac Vice Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/03 4:09 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Janson Westmoreland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37774663) filed by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Texas Bar Certification,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/03 4:02 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37774584) filed by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Supreme Court of Texas Certification,
Att: 2 Supplement Texas Bar Certification,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Pro Hac Vice Order
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/03 3:53 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37774379) filed by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Texas Bar Certification,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/03 3:35 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward R. Nelson III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37774046) filed by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Texas Bar Certification,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 07/03 9:42 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yun Louise Lu counsel for Defendants Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCL Mobile Communication HK Co., Ltd., TCT Mobile US Inc.. Adding Yun (Louise) Lu as counsel of record for Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and TCL Mobile Communication (HK) Co., Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and TCL Mobile Communication (HK) Co., Ltd.. (Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCL Mobile Communication HK Co., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCT Mobile US Inc. (pty:dft))(Lu, Yun)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 cs_rasgn Reassign Case (CV-81) Mon 07/01 4:21 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. (identical case) by Judge Percy Anderson, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Case number now reads as 8:24-cv-01403 JVS(ADSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathank H. Rastegar on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
12 12 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P Griffin on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Janson Westmoreland on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John P Murphy on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward R Nelson III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 06/27 11:25 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:21 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 06/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 06/25 11:44 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by WI-LAN LABS, INC., Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/25 7:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WI-LAN LABS, INC., Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc., (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 06/25 7:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs WI-LAN LABS, INC., Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/25 7:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37721754 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc., WI-LAN LABS, INC., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan E. Hatch added to party WI-LAN LABS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E. Hatch added to party Wi-LAN Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E. Hatch added to party Wi-LAN USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D