Gregory Hansen v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03682 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 6:31 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire Services Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 25
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Hansen
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Terminated: 08/15/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by MSA Safety Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSA Safety Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of MSA Safety Inc, MSA Safety Incorporated, MSA Safety, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of MSA Safety Inc, MSA Safety Incorporated, MSA Safety, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 9:07 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/25/2024), Gregory Hansen v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03682-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern California (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11843789.), filed by Gregory Hansen. Service due by 9/23/2024 (mbon) |