Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-10788

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:24-ap-01474
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
Represented By
Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Dobin
427 Riverview Plaza
Trenton, NJ 08611
Represented By
Andrea Dobin
Mcmanimon Scotland & Baumann, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
court Hearing Held Mon 03/24 12:01 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order Approving Settlement and Compromise Entered Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 16 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 9/26/2024. Discovery due by 1/3/2025. Trial date set for 3/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 03/24 12:08 PM
Adversary Case (3:24-ap-1474) Closed. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
court Hearing Held Thu 02/06 11:42 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Withdrawn Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 30 Motion re: Instructing the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to Accept the Signatory of Trustee Andrea Dobin as the Debtor to Effectuate Title Transfer of Vehicle Filed by Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Fortunato #2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order #3 Proposed Order) Filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
Monday, February 03, 2025
37 37 misc Status Change Form Mon 02/03 3:12 PM
Status Change Form. The matter has been withdrawn, re Related [+] filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-] 30 Motion (Generic) filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
Thursday, January 23, 2025
36 36 court Determination of Adjournment Request Thu 01/23 8:55 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 2/6/25 at 10:00 am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 30 Motion (Generic) filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 01/23 11:04 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 1/23/25 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
Related: [-] 30 Motion re: Instructing the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to Accept the Signatory of Trustee Andrea Dobin as the Debtor to Effectuate Title Transfer of Vehicle Filed by Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Fortunato #2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order #3 Proposed Order) Filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
35 35 answer Response Wed 01/22 2:06 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-] 34 Brief in Opposition to (related document:30 Motion re: Instructing the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to Accept the Signatory of Trustee Andrea Dobin as the Debtor to Effectuate Title Transfer of Vehicle Filed by Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James Fortunato # 2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.) filed by Heather Lynn Anderson on behalf of State of New Jersey, Division of Motor Vehicles. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Anderson, Heather Lynn) filed by Interested Party State of New Jersey, Division of Motor Vehicles
Friday, January 17, 2025
34 34 answer Opposition Fri 01/17 10:06 AM
Brief in Opposition to Related [+] filed by Heather Lynn Anderson on behalf of State of New Jersey, Division of Motor Vehicles. (Anderson, Heather Lynn)
Related: [-] 30 Motion re: Instructing the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to Accept the Signatory of Trustee Andrea Dobin as the Debtor to Effectuate Title Transfer of Vehicle Filed by Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James Fortunato # 2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 02, 2025
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 01/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/02 10:07 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-] 30 Motion (Generic) filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
31 31 court Clerk's Office Quality Control Message - Certification of Service Thu 01/02 8:34 AM
Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 30 Motion re: Instructing the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to Accept the Signatory of Trustee Andrea Dobin as the Debtor to Effectuate Title Transfer of Vehicle Filed by Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James Fortunato # 2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
30 30 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Tue 12/31 4:38 PM
Motion re: Instructing the New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to Accept the Signatory of Trustee Andrea Dobin as the Debtor to Effectuate Title Transfer of Vehicle Filed by Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of James Fortunato
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Order
Att: 3 Proposed Order
29 29 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 12/31 3:10 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND COMPROMISE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF ANDREA DOBIN, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE AND DEFENDANT FORTUNATO CONCRETE POOLS, INC., RESOLVING ADV. PRO. NO. 24-1474 (MEH) PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 105(a) AND FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 AND FOR RELATED RELIEF Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/31/2024. (km)
Related: [-] 25
Monday, December 30, 2024
court Hearing Held Mon 12/30 3:58 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Andrea Dobin.Hearing scheduled for 12/30/2024 at 01:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law #2 Certification #3 Proposed Order) Filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/03 3:59 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Andrea Dobin.Hearing scheduled for 12/30/2024 at 01:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law # 2 Certification # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
27 27 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Tue 12/03 3:50 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re:. Hearing scheduled for 12/30/2024. Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. Objections due by 12/23/2024. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
26 26 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Mon 12/02 2:19 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re:. Hearing scheduled for 12/30/2024. Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. Objections due by 12/23/2024. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Approve Compromise or Settlement Under Rule 9019 Mon 12/02 2:15 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Andrea Dobin.Hearing scheduled for 12/30/2024 at 01:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Certification
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
24 24 misc Mediation Report Tue 11/26 4:35 PM
Mediation Report Related [+] filed by Peter Broege on behalf of Peter J. Broege (Mediator). (Broege, Peter)
Related: [-] 15 Mediation Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Tue 11/19 8:25 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee Amount $ 350.00, Receipt Number 60000709. Fee received from Andrea Dobin (mrg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
court Receipt - Generic - BK - Court Use Only Wed 11/06 5:06 PM
Receipt of Certified Copy. Fee Amount $12.00, Receipt Number 60000695. Fee received from Giordano, Halleran & Ciesla (bwj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
court Receipt - Generic - BK - Court Use Only Fri 11/01 7:42 AM
Receipt of Copy Fee Amount $ 3.00, Receipt Number 60000684. Fee received from Giordano, Halleron and Clesia (mrg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 misc Document Wed 10/23 4:39 PM
Document re: Request for Certified Copy of September 6, 2024 Stipulation and Order Related [+] filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 10/22 1:11 PM
Stipulation Between Andrea Dobin and Defendant Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc., re:Dismissal of Counts I and II Only of Adversary Complaint with Prejudic Related [+] filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
Monday, October 21, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 10/21 12:48 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/24/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (rms)
Related: [-] 16 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 9/26/2024. Discovery due by 1/3/2025. Trial date set for 3/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.
Friday, October 18, 2024
court Order Authorizing Case Reassignment from MBK to MEH Fri 10/18 9:03 AM
Text Order Authorizing Case Reassignment effective October 17, 2024: Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan removed from the case. Judge Mark E. Hall added to the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan on 10/17/2024.. (llb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 misc Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment Tue 10/15 1:28 PM
Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment Related [+] filed by Peter Broege on behalf of Peter J. Broege (Mediator). (Broege, Peter)
Related: [-] 15 Mediation Order
Monday, September 30, 2024
court Hearing Held Mon 09/30 11:07 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: MEDIATION ORDER AND JOINT Scheduling Order PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND TRIAL ENTERED Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued to Andrea Dobin for Service on Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc. Answer due on 7/26/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/26/2024 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Saturday, September 28, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 09/29 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 09/29 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 09/27 6:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dudas, Michele)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 order Joint Scheduling Order Thu 09/26 4:26 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 9/26/2024. Discovery due by 1/3/2025. Trial date set for 3/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Mediation Order Thu 09/26 4:24 PM
Mediation Order. Peter J. Broege (Mediator) added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 9/26/2024. (wiq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 misc Document Tue 09/10 3:26 PM
Document re: Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 3:21 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 08, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 09/09 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Fri 09/06 3:08 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESOLVING APPLICATION FOR TURNOVER OF TRUCK Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. Signed on 9/6/2024. (wiq)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, September 05, 2024
court Hearing Held Fri 09/06 10:25 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Approved; Granted Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Andrea Dobin.Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Certification in Support of Motion #2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Monday, August 26, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 08/26 11:18 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 8/26/24 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (km)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued to Andrea Dobin for Service on Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc. Answer due on 7/26/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/26/2024 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 court Determination of Adjournment Request Wed 08/14 10:38 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to SEPTEMBER 11, 2024 at 11:00 am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 PRE-TRIAL HEARING. (wiq
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Tue 08/06 1:39 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Resolution of Counts 1 and 2. Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2024, 10am. Filed by Andrea Dobin on behalf of Andrea Dobin. Objections due by 08/29/2024. (Dobin, Andrea)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Approve Compromise or Settlement Under Rule 9019 Tue 08/06 1:37 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Andrea Dobin.Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Dobin, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support of Motion
Att: 2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 25, 2024
court Hearing Held Thu 07/25 4:13 PM
Minute of 7/25/2024; Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Settled;Order to be submitted Related [+] (wiq)
Related: [-] 3 Application re: Request for Entry of Order to Show Cause Filed by Andrea Dobin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Entry of Order to Show Cause #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause) Filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Thursday, July 18, 2024
7 7 misc Document Thu 07/18 3:06 PM
Document re: Status Change Form Related [+] filed by Andrea Dobin on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dobin, Andrea)
Related: [-] 3 Application (Generic) filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Monday, July 08, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 07/08 4:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Courtney G. Schroeder on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Schroeder, Courtney)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 07/08 4:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 06/26 10:53 AM
Summons Issued to Andrea Dobin for Service on Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc. Answer due on 7/26/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/26/2024 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (mmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
3 3 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Tue 06/25 2:05 PM
Application re: Request for Entry of Order to Show Cause Filed by Andrea Dobin. (Dobin, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Entry of Order to Show Cause
Att: 2 Proposed Order to Show Cause
2 2 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Tue 06/25 2:00 PM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Andrea Dobin on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Dobin, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/25 1:59 PM
Adversary case 24-01474 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Fortunato Concrete Pools, Inc.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Dobin, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" to Complaint