Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: David B Fannin
Case #: 4:24-cv-00031
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
Braulio Trigueros
d/b/a Trigueros Trucking Braulio Trigueros d/b/a Trigueros Trucking 1001 N. 43rd Ave Sp. 237
Pheoniz, AZ 85009
Plaintiff
Jose Guzman
101 N. Shoreline Blvd. Ste 610
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
Represented By
T. Locke Henry
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/04 3:33 PM
ORDER5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney fees. All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. The Court therefore ORDERS the Clerk of Court CLOSE this action. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/04 3:34 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/03 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jose Guzman (Henry, T.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/02 5:07 PM
Order to Require Service re1 Complaint filed by Jose Guzman. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff provide proof of service on Defendant Braulio Trigueros d/b/a Trigueros Trucking no later than Friday, November 1, 2024. Failure to respond or to explain why service has not been accomplished by this date will result in this case being dismissed against Defendant Braulio Trigueros d/b/a Trigueros Trucking for FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO PROSECUTE OR TO COMPLY under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 06/26 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Braulio Trigueros d/b/a Trigueros Trucking (ab1)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/26 12:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jose Guzman. (Henry, T.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/26 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18919374), filed by Jose Guzman.(Henry, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/26 2:21 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/26 2:22 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
Related: [-]