Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:24-cv-00424
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 2:41 AM CST
Defendant
Ascend Loans, LLC
Represented By
Paul M. Croker
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Conly J. Schulte
Peebles Bergin Schulte & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benhti Economic Development Corporation
Represented By
Eric M Lochen
Lochen Law Offices, PLLC
contact info
Dominic Anthony Isgro
Aegis Professional Services, PLLC
contact info
Emily Marie Feinstein
Quarles & Brady
contact info
Defendant
W6LS, Inc.
Represented By
Paul M. Croker
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Shockley
Represented By
Eric Leighton Crandall
Crandall Law Firm, Sc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Aaniiih Nakoda Finance, LLC
Terminated: 09/25/2024
Defendant
Eagle Valley Ventures
Terminated: 09/06/2024
Represented By
Conly J. Schulte
Peebles Bergin Schulte & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Green Arrow Solutions, LLC
Terminated: 09/05/2024
Defendant
Layma, LLC
Terminated: 09/05/2024
Defendant
Rosebud Lending
Terminated: 09/25/2024
Defendant
Waawaatesi, LLC
Terminated: 09/25/2024
Represented By
Amanda L Lewandowski
Spencer Fane
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
71 71 respm Brief in Reply Thu 02/20 11:39 AM
Brief in Reply by Defendant W6LS, Inc. in Support of62 Motion for Sanctions (Croker, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Documents Filed in Craig Lawsuit,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Documents Filed in Craig Lawsuit