Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Timothy P O'Hara
Case #: 1:24-cv-01789
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:0216(b) - FLSA: Minimum Wage or Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc.
Represented By
Owen Mitchell Davis
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Ashley Warren Jordaan
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Shawna Michelle Wiltsh Ruetz
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Renewable Energy Systems Limited
Represented By
Owen Mitchell Davis
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Ashley Warren Jordaan
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Shawna Michelle Wiltsh Ruetz
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Rohde
Represented By
Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
42 42 minutes Status Conference Tue 05/13 10:31 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 5/13/2025 before Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara. FTR: C402. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 04/17 9:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 04/17/2025. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' First Set of Written Discovery [ECF39 ] is granted. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' written discovery requests on or before April 28, 2025.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
40 40 order Memorandum Thu 04/17 8:42 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' First Set of Written Discovery filed by John Rohde. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 04/17/2024. Text Only Entry (dclem)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/17 8:30 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' First Set of Written Discovery by Plaintiff John Rohde. (Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
38 38 48 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/20 5:11 PM
ANSWER to37 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Renewable Energy Systems Limited, Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc..(Ruetz, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
37 37 27 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 1:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Individual and Class Action Complaint against Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc., Renewable Energy Systems Limited, filed by John Rohde.(Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs misc Notice of Filing Amended Pleading Thu 02/06 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff John Rohde(Sanchez, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit 1 - First Amended Individual and Class Action Complaint (redlined)
Thursday, January 30, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/30 12:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 01/30/2025. Before the Court is "Defendant Renewable Energy Systems Limited's Motion to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss" [ECF31 ]. Because District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher has denied Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF34 ], the Motion to Stay [ECF31 ] is DENIED as moot.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
34 34 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/24 3:44 PM
ORDER by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 1/24/2025. This Court DENIES Defendant Renewable Energy Systems Limited's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual and Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (D.15 ). (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
33 33 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/21 4:25 PM
RESPONSE to31 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff John Rohde. (Sanchez, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
32 32 order Memorandum Mon 01/06 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding31 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Renewable Energy Systems Limited. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 01/06/2025. Text Only Entry (dclem)
Related: [-]
31 31 8 pgs motion Stay Mon 01/06 3:51 PM
MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Renewable Energy Systems Limited. (Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
30 30 utility Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings - PUBLIC Fri 12/06 9:12 AM
Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Terminate duplicate Status Conference. Text Only Entry (ggill, )
Related: [-]
29 29 14 pgs order Scheduling Order Fri 12/06 9:04 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 12/06/2024. (ggill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
28 28 3 pgs minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 12/05 11:03 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 12/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara. A Status Conference is set for May 13, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. before U.S. Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The Court will permit counsel to appear remotely using the attached instructions. Should counsel encounter technical difficulties, counsel may alternatively call the courtroom at (571)353-2301, Access Code 061746309#. Should the parties determine that such a hearing is not necessary, the parties may jointly contact chambers to vacate the hearing. ORDERED: Upon agreement by the Parties, Defendants shall file any motion to stay on or before January 6, 2025 . Plaintiff shall file a response on or before January 20, 2025 . Defendants may file a reply on or before January 27, 2025 . FTR: C402. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
27 27 5 pgs order Protective Order Wed 12/04 9:15 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara on 12/03/2024. (ggill, )
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 12/04 9:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 12/03/2024. The Parties' Stipulated Motion for Entry of Joint Protective Order ECF24 is granted . The Court will enter the Protective Order separately.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
25 25 order Memorandum Tue 12/03 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding24 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc., Renewable Energy Systems Limited. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 12/03/2024. Text Only Entry (dclem)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs motion Protective Order Tue 12/03 1:45 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Renewable Energy Systems Limited, Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc..(Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Joint Protective Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 13 pgs misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 11/27 3:47 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order for Phase I by Plaintiff John Rohde. (Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Minute Order Thu 11/21 3:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 11/21/2024. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The Court hereby advises the Parties that due to the case's re-assignment, the location of the Scheduling Conference has changed . The Scheduling Conference, set for 12/05/2024, at 10:30 a.m., now will take place in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. This will be an in-person proceeding. The Parties shall meet in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and jointly prepare a proposed Scheduling Order in accordance with the form that may be downloaded from the Forms section of the Court's website, www.cod.uscourts.gov. No later than five business days prior to the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file the proposed Scheduling Order with the Clerks Office in accordance with District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Procedures, and (2) submit the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format by joint email, copying all Parties, to Chambers at [LINK:o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] . (ggill, )
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 11/21 2:37 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff John Rohde All parties do not consent.. (Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 10/15 3:08 PM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara upon his appointment. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01789-GPG-TPO. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters before the previously assigned magistrate judge will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara in Courtroom C-402 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His chambers are located in Room C-452 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His telephone number 303-335-2740. (cpear)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order Fri 10/04 8:57 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on October 4, 2024. Consent form due November 21, 2024 . Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due November 27, 2024 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on December 5, 2024 , at 10:30 a.m. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
18 18 12 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/30 5:46 PM
REPLY to Response to15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual and Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Renewable Energy Systems Limited.(Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration
Monday, September 16, 2024
17 17 16 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 09/16 4:17 PM
RESPONSE to15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual and Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Rohde.(Sanchez, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit 1 - Rohde Declaration,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit A to Ex. 1 - Stage Gate Process Guidance,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Ex. 1 - RES Global Announcement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - RES Global Announcement re Denver Headquarters,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - RES Job Position in Colorado - Director Project Governance and Oversight,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - RES Job Position in Colorado - IT Service Delivery Director Development and Construction,
Att: 7 7 pgs Exhibit 5 - UK Company Info - Directors of RES Global
Monday, August 26, 2024
16 16 misc Exhibits Mon 08/26 6:51 PM
Exhibits in Support of15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual and Class Action Complaint by Defendant Renewable Energy Systems Limited. (Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
15 15 13 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 08/26 6:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual and Class Action Complaint by Defendant Renewable Energy Systems Limited.(Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of RES Limited's Motion to Dismiss
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 6:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc..(Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/26 6:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Renewable Energy Systems Holdings Limited for Renewable Energy Systems Limited. (Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/26 6:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Renewable Energy Systems Limited for Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc.. (Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 08/26 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Owen Mitchell Davis on behalf of Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc., Renewable Energy Systems LimitedAttorney Owen Mitchell Davis added to party Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Owen Mitchell Davis added to party Renewable Energy Systems Limited(pty:dft) (Davis, Owen)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 08/26 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shawna Michelle Wiltsh Ruetz on behalf of Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc., Renewable Energy Systems LimitedAttorney Shawna Michelle Wiltsh Ruetz added to party Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shawna Michelle Wiltsh Ruetz added to party Renewable Energy Systems Limited(pty:dft) (Ruetz, Shawna)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 08/26 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Warren Jordaan on behalf of Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc., Renewable Energy Systems LimitedAttorney Ashley Warren Jordaan added to party Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Warren Jordaan added to party Renewable Energy Systems Limited(pty:dft) (Jordaan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
8 8 order Order Fri 07/19 10:48 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 7/19/2024. Plaintiff filed this action asserting diversity jurisdiction. The record is unclear concerning the state (domestic or foreign) of incorporation for each Defendant. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1). To assist the court in promptly scheduling this case, Defendants shall file their Rule 7.1 disclosure statement with their first appearance. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this order to Defendants' counsel. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 07/02 3:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Rohde. Renewable Energy Systems Limited waiver sent on 6/27/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 07/02 3:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Rohde. Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc. waiver sent on 6/27/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 06/27 3:19 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 6/27/2024. Text Only Entry (schap, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 06/27 10:18 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 06/27 6:08 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Cynthia J. Sanchez by Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez on behalf of John RohdeAttorney Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez added to party John Rohde(pty:pla) (Sanchez, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 06/27 10:16 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/26 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc., Renewable Energy Systems Limited (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9749918)Attorney Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison added to party John Rohde(pty:pla), filed by John Rohde.(Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Renewable Energy Systems Limited,
Att: 3 Summons to Renewable Energy Systems Americas Inc.