Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:24-cv-01173
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
David J. Churchill
7324 W. Cheyenne Avenue, Suite 2
Las Vegas, NV 89129
Represented By
Jared B Anderson
Injury Lawyers Of Nevada
contact info
Defendant
Brodey Daffer
Represented By
Michael C. Mills
Bauman Loewe Witt & Maxwell, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sentry Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael C. Mills
Bauman Loewe Witt & Maxwell, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By
Michael C. Mills
Bauman Loewe Witt & Maxwell, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Willoughby Shulman, PLLC
Represented By
Max E. Corrick
Olson, Cannon, Gormley & Stoberski
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Isso
Isso & Associates Law Firm, PLLC 8275 S Eastern Ave Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89123
Represented By
Gary D Reeves
Reeves Law PLC
contact info
Michael Smith, Sr
Law Office Of Michael E. Smith, Esq., P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmy Isso
Isso law 8275 S. Eastern Ave
Las Vegas, NV 89123
Represented By
Gary D Reeves
Reeves Law PLC
contact info
Michael Smith, Sr
Law Office Of Michael E. Smith, Esq., P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
51 51 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Stipulation Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Case Mon 02/10 1:56 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for February 19, 2025, is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is kindly requested to close this case. This case is now closed. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/10/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
50 50 motion Stipulation Tue 02/04 10:34 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendants Brodey Daffer, Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Sentry Casualty Insurance Company. (Canfield, Steven) (dismissal)
Related: [-]