New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:24-cv-07135
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
T.D. BANK
Plaintiff
EDWARD TIMOTHY YOUNG


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/11 3:08 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this action without filing the Complaint or assessing a filing fee; ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this matter, he shall so notify the Court in writing within 30 days and include either the filing fee or a completed IFP application; ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this matter, he must refile the Complaint either in typeface or legible handwriting. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/11/2024. (dmr)(n.m.)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 07/11 3:16 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
2 2 misc Letter Wed 06/26 3:44 PM
Letter from EDWARD TIMOTHY YOUNG indicating living situation. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
1 1 5 pgs service Complaint Received Wed 06/26 3:41 PM
Complaint Received.(aji, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Application IFP Blank,
Att: 3 Envelope