Bechel et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03629 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-03805 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:52 AM EST |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Reina Matychak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanita Parr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geoffrey Osteen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristie Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Lovell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margot Muhammad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oswaldo Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Warren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Luna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Mackey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Peritz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Reading
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donnie Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Starr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Steele
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Stetson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawnice Street
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Swaby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fabian Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Andrade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Bechel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Boswell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobbie Boyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Broullire
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Browne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laylah Bruckner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
US Mag Robert Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Durham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Edinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raven El
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Elias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Link
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Fasnacht
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Feldstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorraina Frederick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Gauthier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phylliss Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helen Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendra Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia Hickson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Himmenger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Hirsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marques Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelly Lamothe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fabian Thomas WITHOUT PEJUDICE (Cade, Gregory) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Cade on behalf of Fabian Thomas (Cade, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Harris, Patricia Minietta, Juan Hernandez, Michael Blau, Joseph Anthony Lupica, Ken Coles, Lisa Yoder, James Mariott, Janie Vega-Nichols, James Connell, Angela Green, Donald McCain, Raul Gil, Erika Rexrode, Robert Velazquez, James Bice, Keith Jones, Paul Mussatto, Larry Newman, Billy Ashley, Brian Lauterbach, Steuart Pond NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 3:39 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 6/21/2024), 1:24-cv-03805, Bechel et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03629-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-03805. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2024.] | ||
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2024.] | ||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2024.] | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |