Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:24-cv-00598
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Case in other court:In the Circuit Court of the Third Judicial Circuit, 24-CA-002765
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By
Ashley Marie Powell
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Keller
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kuhn Law Firm PA
Represented By
Larry Moskowitz
Larry Moskowitz, P.A.
contact info
Edward McDonough
Larry Moskowitz, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
26 26 misc Judgment Wed 02/19 9:04 AM
JUDGMENT that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/18 12:22 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/18/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 01/16 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Thu 01/16 9:46 AM
ORDER directing administrative closure for 30 days. All motions and deadlines are terminated in light of the administrative closure. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/16/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
22 22 adr Mediation report Wed 01/15 5:05 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 1/9/2025. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/12 3:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 defendant's unopposed motion to amend the hurricane scheduling order. (Doc. 7 ). The deadlines to notice fact witness depositions and all deadlines thereafter are extended by 60 days. All other provisions of the hurricane scheduling order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/12/2024. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 11/11 4:34 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fact Witness Depositions by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
19 19 adr Notice of selection of mediator Fri 08/09 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Robert Daisley as mediator by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 07/31 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward McDonough on behalf of Kuhn Law Firm PA. Lead Counsel: Edward J. McDonough. (McDonough, Edward)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/31 2:27 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kuhn Law Firm PA. (BD)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 07/31 11:03 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file corporate disclosure statement. The clerk is directed to separately docket plaintiff's disclosure statement attached to plaintiff's motion (Doc. [15-1]). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/31/2024. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 07/30 6:04 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kuhn Law Firm PA.(Moskowitz, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of compliance Wed 07/10 5:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re7 Case Management Scheduling Order by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/10 3:32 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order directing compliance Order to Strike Wed 07/10 9:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: Local Rule 3.03 requires that each party file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. However, plaintiff has not filed its disclosure. And defendant used an outdated form in filing its disclosure. As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete the PDF file (Doc. 10) from the CM/ECF docket. By July 24, 2024, plaintiff must file, and defendant must refile, their disclosure statements using the proper form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/10/2024. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE by Nationwide General Insurance Company re7 Case Management Scheduling Order Pendency of Other Actions (Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/09 3:08 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/09 1:44 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Powell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
8 8 order Protective Order Tue 07/02 2:52 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/2/2024.(WRW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
7 7 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 07/02 2:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/2/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Civil Action Order Tue 07/02 2:50 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/2/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 06/27 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Thomas A. Keller, Esq. (Keller, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 06/27 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Nationwide General Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Kuhn Law Firm PA. (Originally filed in State Court on 4/10/2024) (BD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 06/27 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Larry Moskowitz, Thomas A. Keller and Ashley Marie Powell of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/27 11:54 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-598-JES-NPM. (AJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 06/27 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 20th Judicial Circuit, Lee County, Florida, case number 24-CA-002765 filed in State Court on 4/10/24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22241900 filed by All Defendants.(Powell, Ashley) Modified on 6/27/2024 to edit docket text (AJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Notice of Appearance,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents Composite Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet