Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10943

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:24-ap-01448
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 13, 2024 1:26 PM EST
Defendant
Kira Elizabeth Bazile
Represented By
Kira Elizabeth Bazile
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul R. Hage, as Plan Administrator for the Voyager Wind-Down Debtor
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul R. Hage
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Mon 03/24 4:42 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Lucian B. Murley.(Murley, Lucian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 motion Motion, Mediation Mon 01/13 12:49 PM
Motion for Mediation // Amended Notice of Scheduling of Mediation Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Paul R. Hage. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 2 pgs motion Motion, Mediation Thu 12/12 2:06 PM
Motion for Mediation // Notice of Scheduling of Mediation filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Paul R. Hage. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 19, 2024
5 5 misc Transcript Thu 09/19 11:36 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 09/17/2024 At 11:04 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/18/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/26/2024. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/10/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/21/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/18/2024. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 07/31 10:39 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing & Pre-Trial Conference schedule for August 14, 2024 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/23 2:14 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Paul R. Hage. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Friday, June 28, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/28 10:22 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW), Answer due by 7/29/2024, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 06/27 1:05 PM
Adversary case 24-01448 Complaint against Kira Elizabeth Bazile (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Paul R. Hage. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 06/27 2:17 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01448 mew] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16689024. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1