Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10352

New York Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carl L Bucki
Case #: 1:24-ap-01006
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christopher Michael Reichmuth
47 Christophel Dr.
Depew, NY 14043
Represented By
Christopher Michael Reichmuth
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia A. Stelter
60 Wayne Street
Depew, NY 14043
Represented By
Joseph M. Shur
Relin, Goldstein & Crane LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
11 11 court Returned Mail Wed 10/02 12:20 PM
Returned Mail: Docket Number 8 Order Granting Stipulation and Notice of Entry. Undeliverable: Patricia A. Stelter 60 Wayne Street Depew, NY 14043-3515 (Nieves, J.)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/02 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1006 Closed (TEXT ONLY EVENT) (Flag set: CLOSED) (Flag removed: APpending) (Nieves, J.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 14, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 09/15 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Stipulation of Settlement
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Entry Sun 09/15 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Entry. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Stipulation of Settlement
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 order Stipulation of Settlement Thu 09/12 10:14 AM
Order Granting Stipulation of Settlement Related [+]. Signed on 9/12/2024. (Nieves, J.)
Related: [-] related doc(s)7 Stipulation of Settlement
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 motion Stipulation of Settlement Tue 09/10 11:00 AM
Stipulation of Settlement Filed on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia A. Stelter (Shur, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
6 6 court Summons Issued Tue 07/02 11:07 AM
Summons Issued on 7/2/2024 to Plaintiff or Plaintiffs Attorney re: Defendant, Christopher Michael Reichmuth . (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/01 11:31 AM
First Amended Complaint and Summons by Joseph M. Shur on behalf of Patricia A. Stelter against Christopher Michael Reichmuth. Related [+]. (Shur, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 1 24-01006 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). Complaint Filed by Patricia A. Stelter vs Christopher Michael Reichmuth. Statutory Fee Due: $350. (Flag set: AP, APpending) filed by Plaintiff Patricia A. Stelter
Sunday, June 30, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/01 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Deficiency Notice
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 misc Deficiency Notice Fri 06/28 11:54 AM
Deficiency Notice. Related [+]. (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Patricia A. Stelter
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/26 2:27 PM
Receipt of Statutory Fee for Complaint([LINK:1 24-01006 CLB] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt #A14818634, Amount Received $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/26 2:24 PM
Adversary case 1 24-01006 14 Related [+]. Complaint Filed by Patricia A. Stelter vs Christopher Michael Reichmuth. Statutory Fee Due: $350. (Flag set: AP, APpending) (Shur, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other