Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas O Rice
Case #: 2:24-cv-00221
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 1:00 AM PST
Defendant
Technidea Corporation
Represented By
Geoffrey M Hersch
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Vories
Represented By
Geoffrey M Hersch
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Plaintiff
James Marshall
Represented By
Gregory M Skidmore
Skidmore & Fomina PLLC
contact info
Mason Cole Hudon
Skidmore & Fomina PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/25 10:37 AM
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/11/2026 at 9:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. A Jury Trial is set for 3/23/2026 at 8:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/30/2025 is STRICKEN from the Court's calendar. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Association of Counsel Fri 04/25 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by John M Kreutzer on behalf of Dennis Vories, Technidea Corporation (Attorney John M Kreutzer added to party Dennis Vories(pty:dft), Attorney John M Kreutzer added to party Technidea Corporation(pty:dft))(Kreutzer, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Thu 04/24 3:51 PM
STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Skidmore, Gregory)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Status Report Thu 04/24 11:30 AM
STATUS REPORT by James Marshall. (Skidmore, Gregory)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Thu 04/24 9:52 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER AT ECF NO. 13. The parties shall comply with the requirements of the Court's Order at ECF No. 13 no later than 4/24/2025 at 5:00 PM (PST) . This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. No PDF document will follow. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 3 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 10:54 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/30/2025 at 8:45 AM via Zoom audio before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The parties' Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 4/16/2025 and must comply with the requirements of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clive A Pontusson on behalf of James Marshall (Attorney Clive A Pontusson added to party James Marshall(pty:pla))(Pontusson, Clive)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sun 11/17 10:29 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
10 10 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/15 5:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Hersch, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 11/15 5:29 PM
DECLARATION by Casondra J. Albrecht in Support re8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Hersch, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/15 5:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Technidea Corporation, Dennis Vories. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Hersch, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/15 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M Hersch on behalf of Technidea Corporation, Dennis Vories (Attorney Geoffrey M Hersch added to party Technidea Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Geoffrey M Hersch added to party Dennis Vories(pty:dft))(Hersch, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 2:40 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/18 2:47 PM
MOTION Deem Defendant Technidea Corp. as properly served with process by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Hudon, Mason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Mason C. Hudon w/ Exhibits
Friday, June 28, 2024
4 4 order Clerks Order of Random Reassignment Fri 06/28 10:14 AM
Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (AY, DQA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/27 1:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Technidea Corporation, Dennis Vories.(LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Dennis Vories
2 2 notice Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Thu 06/27 1:27 PM
Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 7/8/2024. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/27 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4577829) Jury Demand. Filed by James Marshall.(Hudon, Mason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Employment Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to Defendant Technidea Corporation,
Att: 3 Summons Summons to Defendant Dennis Vories
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 06/27 1:24 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]