Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-60018

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 6:24-ap-06006
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cameron International Corporation
3600 Briarpark Drive
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
Cameron International Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Nitro Fluids, LLC
117 Broadway
Nordheim, TX 78141
Represented By
Kenneth P. Green
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Eric Thomas Haitz
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NFH Leasing, LLC
117 Broadway
Nordheim, TX 78141
Represented By
Kenneth P. Green
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Eric Thomas Haitz
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Straitline Pumps, LLC
13750 San Pedro Ave.
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
Kenneth P. Green
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Eric Thomas Haitz
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 10/10 3:17 PM
Stipulation By Cameron International Corporation, NFH Leasing, LLC, Nitro Fluids, LLC, Straitline Pumps, LLC and. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Cameron International Corporation, NFH Leasing, LLC, Nitro Fluids, LLC, Straitline Pumps, LLC ) Related [+] (Eppich, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, August 12, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 4:19 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Related [+] Filed by Cameron International Corporation (Francis, Dwight)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 01, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/01 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 order Generic Order Tue 07/30 1:20 PM
Stipulation to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+]. Signed on 7/30/2024. (rgs4)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Friday, July 26, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 07/26 4:32 PM
Stipulation By Cameron International Corporation and Nitro Fluids, LLC, NFH Leasing, LLC, Straitline Pumps, LLC. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Cameron International Corporation ). (Francis, Dwight)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
5 5 motion Consolidate Thu 07/11 11:39 AM
Motion to Consolidate with Filed by NFH Leasing, LLC, Nitro Fluids, LLC, Straitline Pumps, LLC (Eppich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 07/05 5:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Cameron International Corporation 6/28/2024. (Haitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 06/28 2:14 PM
Summons Issued on Cameron International Corporation Date Issued 6/28/2024. (rlm4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 06/27 12:23 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Cameron International Corporation. (Eppich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 06/26 8:11 PM
Adversary case 24-06006 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)) Complaint by Nitro Fluids, LLC, NFH Leasing, LLC, Straitline Pumps, LLC against Cameron International Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (Eppich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A