Donius, et al. v. Hightimes Holding Corp.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00761 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Hightimes Holding Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jill L. Donius
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark C. Donius
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
utility
- CORRECTING ENTRY
Thu 03/13 2:29 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The second attachment for D.I.8 was replaced to correct a formatting error. (scs) |
||
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Letter to Steve Le Faucheur, from The Clerk of Court, responding to request for case information (D.I.8 ). (scs) Modified on 3/12/2025 (nms) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Letter to Judge Richard G. Andrews from Steve Le Faucheur, requesting case information.(scs) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, November 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jill L. Donius, Mark C. Donius as to Hightimes Holding Corp. (deLeeuw, Peter) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Fri 11/01 11:36 AM
CASE CLOSED per entry of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal at D.I.7 . (nms) |
||
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Oral Order
Tue 10/29 10:01 AM
ORAL ORDER: A status letter is due no later than three (3) days from the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/2024. (nms) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Oral Order
Tue 10/01 2:02 PM
ORAL ORDER: The request for an extension of time to effectuate service until October 25, 2024 (D.I.4 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/1/2024. (nms) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding 09/25/2024 Order - re 3 Oral Order. (deLeeuw, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Oral Order
Wed 09/25 4:43 PM
ORAL ORDER: 90 days have elapsed since the Complaint was filed, and summons have not been requested or issued. Plaintiff is now directed to file a status letter within 3 days of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/25/2024. (nms) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/03 10:13 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Hightimes Holding Corp. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4439900.) - filed by Mark C. Donius, Jill L. Donius.(jfm) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
service
No Summons Issued
Thu 06/27 3:56 PM
No Summons Issued. (jfm) |