Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William Matthewman
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:24-cv-80787
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Coal Capital Ephrata, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
NR Connecticut, LLC
a Connecticut Limited Liability Corporation 3543 Main Street 2nd Floor
Bridgeport, CT 06606
Defendant
NR Pennsylvania Associates, LLC
Represented By
Maja Veselinovic
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Robert C. Perryman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
HFGC Florida, LLC
Represented By
Maja Veselinovic
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Robert C. Perryman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
David Silberstein
Represented By
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
DRPS Management, LLC
Defendant
Coal New Haven LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
Coal Lake Worth, LLC
Represented By
Maja Veselinovic
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Robert C. Perryman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Coal Connecticut, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
Coal Capital Holdings (Florida) LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
Coal Capital Group, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
CLW Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
James Young
Represented By
Maja Veselinovic
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Defendant
Retreat Behavioral Health, LLC
A Florida Limited Liability Corporation 1001 E. 19th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11230
Defendant
NR Florida Associates, LLC
A Florida Limited Liability Corporation 1001 E. 19th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11230
Represented By
Maja Veselinovic
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Christopher Michael Cascino
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Robert C. Perryman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Alexander Hoinsky
Represented By
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
Christy Gariano
Represented By
Peter David Ticktin
Ticktin Law Group PA
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Scott Korogodsky
Defendant
Estate of Peter Schorr
Plaintiff
Alisa Leggett
Represented By
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Ryan David Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dedtra Davis
Represented By
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Ryan David Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mia Williams
Represented By
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Ryan David Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Michelle Erin Nadeau
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittany Calvert
Represented By
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Ryan David Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Michelle Erin Nadeau
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
179 179 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/14 11:35 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting177 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Good cause is shown. Therefore, Defendants Coal Lake Worth, LLC, HFGC Florida, LLC, James Young, and NR Pennsylvania Associates, LLC shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint by May 22, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/14/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
178 178 5 pgs misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 05/13 9:30 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re146 Scheduling Order,,, 172 Status Report Order,,, by Coal New Haven LLC.(Fojo, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Status Report
177 177 6 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/13 4:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to74 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by James Young, Coal Lake Worth, LLC, HFGC Florida, LLC.(Martin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
176 176 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/13 10:33 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting175 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer. Good cause is shown. Therefore, Defendants Alexander Hoinsky, Christy Gariano, David Silberstein, Coal Capital Holdings (Florida) LLC, Coal Connecticut, LLC, Coal Capital Ephrata, LLC, Coal Capital Group, LLC, and CLW Holdings, LLC shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint by May 22, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/13/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
175 175 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 05/12 9:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to167 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, by Coal Capital Ephrata, LLC, Coal Capital Group, LLC, David Silberstein, Christy Gariano, CLW Holdings, LLC, Coal Capital Holdings (Florida) LLC, Coal Connecticut, LLC, Alexander Hoinsky. (Fojo, Ryan)
Related: [-]
174 174 13 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 05/12 7:30 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Estate of Peter Schorr. (Hankins, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
173 173 order Status Report Order Fri 05/09 1:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Young Defendants' Status Report [DE 169] which states that a "sale hearing to consider whether to approve the sale will be held on May 7, 2025" and that "[i]t is anticipated that the closing of the sale will occur within 30-days of the order approving the sale of the property." Therefore, the Young Defendants shall file an updated status report by June 13, 2025, updating the Court of the asset sale. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/9/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
172 172 order Status Report Order Fri 05/09 1:32 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: On March 26, 2025, the Court stayed this case as to Defendant Coal New Haven LLC pursuant to the bankruptcy proceedings and ordered that "counsel for Coal New Haven LLC shall filed a status report by April 25, 2025, updating the Court on the bankruptcy proceedings and whether the stay has been lifted." [DE 145]. No status report has been filed. Therefore, counsel for Coal New Haven LLC shall SHOW CAUSE for their failure to comply with the Court's Order and shall update the Court as to the status of Coal New Haven LLC's bankruptcy proceedings by May 13, 2025. The Court will consider sanctions for any further noncompliance with Court Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/9/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
171 171 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 4:33 PM
Joint NOTICE of Filing Revised Class Notice(s) by Mia Williams, Alisa Leggett, Brittany Calvert re168 Order (Nadeau, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1 - Class Notice for All States,
Att: 2 15 pgs Exhibit 2 - Class Notices for Each State
170 170 3 pgs misc Supplement Wed 05/07 4:29 PM
SUPPLEMENT to168 Order by Mia Williams, Alisa Leggett, Brittany Calvert (Nadeau, Michelle)
Related: [-]