Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-02377

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul Sala
Case #: 2:24-ap-00144
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Douglas K. Kouffie
916 W. Citrus Way
Chandler, AZ 85248
Represented By
Douglas K. Kouffie
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY GULLEDGE
Represented By
Christopher Post
Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEESHA WHITE
Represented By
Christopher Post
Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
18 18 vCal CHAP Virtual Minute Entry - Set Hearing Tue 05/13 2:52 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 09/09/2025 Subject: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE Appearances: NONE Proceedings: VACATED: RESCHEDULED ON COURT'S OWN MOTION. Related [+] Pre-Trial Hearing set for 09/16/2025 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., Crtrm 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) The Hearing Judge is Judge Paul Sala (MMK)
Related: [-] 7 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures
17 17 court Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Form (Adv & Misc) Tue 05/13 2:49 PM
Notice of Hearing on an Adversary. Related [+] Hearing set for 9/16/2025 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., Crtrm 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) . (MMK)
Related: [-] 15 CHAP Minute Entry Continued
Thursday, November 21, 2024
16 16 audio audio Thu 11/21 10:07 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [11/19/2024 11:04:20 AM]. File Size [ 3899 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:07 ]. (audiouser)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 vCal CHAP Minute Entry Continued Wed 11/20 1:26 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on:11/19/2024 Subject: Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures signed on 9/16/2024 (related document(s)1 Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint) Pre-Trial Hearing set for 09/09/2025 at 10:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., Crtrm 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) The Hearing Judge is Judge Paul Sala (MMK
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 audio audio Thu 11/07 3:52 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [11/05/2024 10:30:56 AM]. File Size [ 2814 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:49 ]. (audiouser)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 vCal CHAP Minute Entry Continued Tue 11/05 12:44 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 11/5/2024 Subject: Related [+] Continued Scheduling Hearing set for 11/19/2024 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., Crtrm 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) The Hearing Judge is Judge Paul Sala (MMK)
Related: [-] 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures signed on 9/16/2024 (related document(s)1 Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint)
Friday, October 25, 2024
12 12 order oSubstitute Attorney Fri 10/25 11:49 AM
ORDER Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney terminating Christopher Post, adding Paul D. Friedman for AMY GULLEDGE and ALEESHA WHIT Related [+] signed on 10/25/2024 . (ETS)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Substitute Attorney (Motion to) Fri 10/25 10:57 AM
Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Christopher Post of Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC on behalf of AMY GULLEDGE, ALEESHA WHITE. (Post, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
10 10 other Stipulation Thu 10/24 12:42 PM
Stipulation re Joint Case Management and Discovery Plan filed by Christopher Post of Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC on behalf of AMY GULLEDGE, ALEESHA WHITE. (Post, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 notice Certificate of Service Tue 09/24 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Christopher Post of Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC on behalf of AMY GULLEDGE, ALEESHA WHITE.(Post, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 09/18 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures
7 7 order oSetting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Form Mon 09/16 9:40 AM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures signed on 9/16/2024 Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2024 at 10:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., Crtrm 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) . (MMK)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/13 1:08 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by JOHN N SKIBA of Arizona Consumer Law Group, PLC on behalf of Douglas K. Kouffie Related [+]. (SKIBA, JOHN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 15, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Mon 07/15 1:38 PM
Notice of Filing Acceptance of Service filed by Christopher Post of Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC on behalf of AMY GULLEDGE.(Post, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
court Receipt for Adversary Filing Fee Tue 07/02 6:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 from JOSEPH BROWN AND ASSOCIATES, LLC. Receipt Number 22002638. (SL) (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued (Form) Mon 07/01 9:54 AM
Summons Issued . (SAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 06/28 10:49 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Christopher Post of Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC on behalf of AMY GULLEDGE. (Post, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
2 2 order oPay Adversary Filing Fee - VAN Form Thu 06/27 9:59 AM
ORDER to Pay Adversary Filing Fee signed on 6/27/2024 . (ETS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/27 9:59 AM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00144. Complaint (350.00 fee) against Douglas K. Kouffie filed by Christopher Post of Brown, Crowell & Friedman, PLLC on behalf of AMY GULLEDGE, ALEESHA WHITE Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) . (ETS) Modified file date on 6/27/2024 (ETS)
Related: [-]