Pierre L. Priest v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03727 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 3:52 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Pierre L. Priest
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 06/27 2:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/27/2024), Pierre L. Priest v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03727-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Kentucky (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11848109.), filed by Pierre L. Priest. Service due by 9/25/2024 (mbon) |