California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Valerie E Torres
Case #: 3:24-cv-01120
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331vc Fed. Question: Violation of Constitutional Rights
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Terminated:Aug 19, 2024
Case in other court:Superiror Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02024- 00019680-CU-MC-CTL
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
Danielle Millen
Defendant
Rodney Dorval
Defendant
Michele Wolfman
Defendant
Jennifer Wilson
Defendant
Brad Williams
Defendant
Katie Tennant
Defendant
Shari Saperstein
Defendant
Jennifer Ramos
Defendant
Nova Southeastern University
Represented By
Nikki Wilson
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Sarah Raoof
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Johnson
Defendant
Donna Hillier
Defendant
George Hanbury
Defendant
Karen Grosby
Defendant
Denise Carrazco
Defendant
Stephanie Akl
Plaintiff
Lindsey Mack
an individual 4577 Da Vinci Street
San Diego, CA 92130

GPO Aug 19 2024
ORDER : (1) Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) [Doc. No. 5]; and Denying Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) [Doc. No. 4]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/19/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (anh)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 19, 2024
9 9 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 08/19 11:21 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the motion to dismiss is GRANTED based on the lack of opposition and on its merits for the reasons set forth. The complaint is therefore DISMISSED. The motion to strike portions of the complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. Case Closed.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/19 11:19 AM
ORDER : (1) Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) [Doc. No.5 ]; and Denying Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) [Doc. No.4 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/19/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
7 7 3 pgs respm Non Opposition to Motion Wed 07/31 1:53 PM
NON Opposition re4 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Complaint filed by Nova Southeastern University. (Raoof, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Non Opposition to Motion Wed 07/31 1:52 PM
NON Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nova Southeastern University. (Raoof, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/03 10:08 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nova Southeastern University.(Raoof, Sarah) (dim).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
4 4 motion Strike Wed 07/03 9:55 AM
MOTION to Strike Portions of the Complaint by Nova Southeastern University.(Raoof, Sarah) (dim).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Thursday, June 27, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/27 5:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nova Southeastern University. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (ggv)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 06/27 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Nova Southeastern University. No Parties With Financial Interest. (ggv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 06/27 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18970779.), filed by Nova Southeastern University. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1120-CAB-VET. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case.(ggv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Declaration of Nikki Wilson ISO Removal