Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-07717
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 28, 2024 1:29 AM MST
Defendant
Brandon Correa-Abril (1)
Represented By
Jordan Perry Malka
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/28/2024 7:14 AM MST
Monday, June 24, 2024
Arrest of Brandon Correa-Abril on 6/24/2024. (BHA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Brandon Correa-Abril. (BHA)
Related: [-]