Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02631
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 28, 2024 2:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Israel Betancourt-Aguilar (1)
Represented By
Sandra S. Lewis
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/28/2024 4:39 AM CDT
Sunday, June 23, 2024
Arrest of Israel Betancourt-Aguilar (ll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar held on 6/25/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T. McEney) as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar, (Detention Hearing set for 7/3/2024 01:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 7/3/2024 01:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Israel Betancourt-Aguilar. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]