California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:12-cv-01894
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2012
Terminated:Jun 02, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 9:10 AM PST
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
Represented By
Kristine Anne Forderer
Cooley LLP
contact info
Benjamin Hansel Kleine
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael G. Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Whitty Somvichian
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
I. B.
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Daniel B. Edelman
Katz, Marshall And Banks LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gordon Edelman
Attorney Of The Law
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Cutter Law P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Glynnis Bohannon
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Daniel B. Edelman
Katz, Marshall And Banks LLP
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Cutter Law P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
J. W.
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Daniel B. Edelman
Katz, Marshall And Banks LLP
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Cutter Law P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Wright
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Daniel B. Edelman
Katz, Marshall And Banks LLP
contact info
John R. Parker, Jr.
Cutter Law P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 27 2012
ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS (28, 30) OPPOSITION AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
GPO Oct 25 2012
ORDER by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss, denying motion to strike; Third Amended Complaint due within twenty-one days of the date of this order (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012) Modified on 10/26/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
GPO Dec 20 2013
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 53 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
GPO May 14 2014
ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 01:30 PM. Motions for Class Certification due by 8/21/2014, Opposition to Motions for Class Certification due by 10/16/2014, Replies to Oppositions due by 11/25/2014. Class Certification Hearing set for 12/18/2014 09:00 AM. Bench Trial set for 10/19/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. All Hearing set before Judge Beth Labson Freeman, U.S. District Court 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/14/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
GPO Nov 03 2014
ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting Defendant's Request to File Certain Documents Under Seal re: Docket Entry 81. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
GPO Nov 03 2014
ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
GPO Dec 02 2014
ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
GPO Mar 10 2015
Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Certify Class. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
GPO Dec 29 2016
ORDER GRNATING 138 STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/29/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
GPO Mar 09 2016
ORDER RE 150 OBJECTIONS TO REPLY EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
GPO May 23 2016
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 142 MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
GPO May 23 2016
ORDER RE REVISED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
GPO May 26 2016
ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
GPO Jun 02 2016
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
GPO Jun 02 2016
ORDER RE 164 CLARIFICATION OF ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, January 24, 2019
194 194 oth_sup Exhibits Thu 01/24 7:56 PM
EXHIBITS re192 Order on Motion to Unseal Document Exhibit DD filed byFacebook, Inc.. Related [+] (Somvichian, Whitty)
Related: [-] 192
Att: 1 Exhibit EE,
Att: 2 Exhibit GG,
Att: 3 Exhibit II,
Att: 4 Exhibit JJ (redacted),
Att: 5 Exhibit KK,
Att: 6 Exhibit LL,
Att: 7 Exhibit MM,
Att: 8 Exhibit NN,
Att: 9 Exhibit OO (redacted),
Att: 10 Exhibit PP
193 193 oth_sup Exhibits Thu 01/24 7:04 PM
EXHIBITS re192 Order on Motion to Unseal Document filed byFacebook, Inc.. Related [+] (Somvichian, Whitty)
Related: [-] 192
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit D (redacted),
Att: 3 Exhibit F,
Att: 4 Exhibit H,
Att: 5 Exhibit I,
Att: 6 Exhibit K,
Att: 7 Exhibit L,
Att: 8 Exhibit M,
Att: 9 Exhibit N,
Att: 10 Exhibit O,
Att: 11 Exhibit P,
Att: 12 Exhibit Q,
Att: 13 Exhibit R,
Att: 14 Exhibit U,
Att: 15 Exhibit V